ACI Payments v. Conservice
Plaintiff: ACI Payments
Defendant: Conservice
Case Number: 1:2021cv00084
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Conservice identifying TA Associates and Advent International as Corporate Parent. (Brown, Kendra)
July 19, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Conservice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Terms and Conditions, #2 Exhibit B - Billing Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Power of Attorney)(Brown, Kendra)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney I. Neel Chatterjee for Conservice.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 7/13/21. (dla)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Theresa Ann Sutton for Conservice.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 7/13/21. (dla)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Adam Slutsky for Conservice.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 7/13/21. (dla)
July 13, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Neel Chatterjee , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4056479,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Conservice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PHV Application of Neel Chatterjee, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Kendra)
July 13, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Theresa Ann Sutton , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4056499,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Conservice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PHV Application of Theresa Ann Sutton, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Kendra)
July 13, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adam Slutsky , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4056486,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Conservice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PHV Application of Adam Slutsky, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Kendra)
June 25, 2021 Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendant Conservice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Kendra)
June 25, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra M. Brown on behalf of Conservice (Brown, Kendra)
June 25, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith A. Call on behalf of Conservice (Call, Keith)
June 10, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff ACI Payments identifying ACI Worldwide Corp. as Corporate Parent. (Brown, Kamie)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sara J. Sherman for ACI Payments.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 6/8/21. (dla)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Millard A. Johnson for ACI Payments.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 6/8/21. (dla)
June 8, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sara J. Sherman , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4026560,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff ACI Payments. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order - Exhibit B)(Brown, Kamie)
June 8, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Millard A. Johnson , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4026553,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff ACI Payments. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order - Exhibit B)(Brown, Kamie)
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by ACI Payments as to Conservice served on 6/7/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Brown, Kamie)
June 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Millard A. Johnson and Sara J. Sherman, for Plaintiff ACI Payments. (mh)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Conservice. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT and Application for Permanent Injunction against Conservice (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4023777) filed by ACI Payments. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet - Exhibit A) Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (Brown, Kamie)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Plaintiff ACI Payments is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACI Payments v. Conservice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACI Payments
Represented By: Kamie F. Brown
Represented By: Millard A. Johnson
Represented By: Sara J. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conservice
Represented By: Adam Slutsky
Represented By: I. Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Keith A. Call
Represented By: Kendra M. Brown
Represented By: Theresa Ann Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?