Murphy v. Utah Department of Corrections et al
Petitioner: Anthony Charles Murphy
Respondent: Robert Powell and Utah Department of Corrections
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 1:2021cv00097
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Letter to the Judge re: Motion to Appoint Counsel no. 2. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 Modification of Docket: Error: Petitioner's Brief was not included in original entry. Correction: Attached Brief. re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254. (nmt)
July 1, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Memorandum in Support filed by Petitioner Anthony Charles Murphy. (nmt)
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 4681095020) Fee Status: Paid. (Originally received on 07/01/2021) filed by Anthony Charles Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (nmt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2021: #4 Brief of Petitioner for 2254) (nmt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Utah Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Utah Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Charles Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?