Bachman Realty et al v. United States Forest Service et al
Plaintiff: Bachman Realty, Michael S. Bachman and Debbie R. Bachman
Defendant: United States Forest Service and Northrop Grumman Systems
Case Number: 1:2021cv00107
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A Kimball
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Bachman Realty, Michael S. Bachman, Debbie R. Bachman as to Northrop Grumman Systems Waiver sent on 7/29/2021, answer due 9/27/2021. (Fox, J.)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bachman Realty, Michael S. Bachman, Debbie R. Bachman. United States Forest Service served on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (Fox, J.)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiffs must propose a schedule to defendants in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one (21) days after any defendant has been served or any defendant has appeared, unless any party is appearing pro se. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/4/2021. (eat)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 8/3/2021. (eat)
July 29, 2021 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to the Acting United States Attorney, District of Utah. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Northrop Grumman Systems. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Northrop Grumman Systems, United States Forest Service (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4068765) filed by Bachman Realty, Michael S. Bachman, Debbie R. Bachman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet CCS) Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (Fox, J.)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Plaintiffs Debbie R. Bachman, Michael S. Bachman, Bachman Realty are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bachman Realty et al v. United States Forest Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bachman Realty
Represented By: J. Tayler Fox
Represented By: John V. Tipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S. Bachman
Represented By: J. Tayler Fox
Represented By: John V. Tipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie R. Bachman
Represented By: J. Tayler Fox
Represented By: John V. Tipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?