Lopez v. Davis County et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Ernest Lopez
Defendant: Davis County, Layton City District Court and Joseph Mason Kjar
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 1:2021cv00114
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #6 . Resent to new address on file. (jl)
September 13, 2021 Filing 8 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Jerry Ernest Lopez received from Correctional Institution (jl)
September 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jerry Ernest Lopez. (jl) Modified by correcting filing date on 9/15/2021 (jl).
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 8/27/2021. (nl)
August 30, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Jerry Ernest Lopez. (Originally received by the court on 8/20/2021) (nmt) Modified on 9/7/2021 to add original date received.(nl).
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Davis County, Joseph Mason Kjar, Layton City District Court (Originally received by the court on 08/20/2021). (Fee Status: TBD) filed by Jerry Ernest Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge David Barlow (nmt)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. So the Court may figure Plaintiff's initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff shall have thirty days from today to file with the Court a certified copy of Plaintiff's inmate trust fund account statement(s). If Plaintiff was held at more than one institution during the past six months, Plaintiff shall file certified trust fund account statements (or institutional equivalent) from the appropriate official at each institution. The certified trust fund account statement(s) must show deposits and average balances for each month. If Plaintiff does not fully comply, the complaint will be dismissed Collection of Fees Sent: No Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 08/27/2021. (nmt)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Complaint, Envelope and Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2021: #2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel) (nmt). Modified to add Motion on 8/20/2021 (nmt).
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 08/20/2021) filed by Plaintiff Jerry Ernest Lopez. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Davis County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Ernest Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Layton City District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Mason Kjar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?