LBG Ogden Five Points et al v. Ridley's Family Markets et al
Plaintiff: LBG Ogden Five Points doing business as Westerra Realty & Management and Cincinnati Insurance Company
Defendant: Ridley's Family Markets and Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00125
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
2 Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Justiciability filed by Defendants Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Ridley's Family Markets. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farr, Douglas)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendants shall have an extension of time through and including October 15, 2021 to file a response to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/11/2021. (reb)
October 11, 2021 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Evans, Robert)
October 8, 2021 Filing 18 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Defendants Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Ridley's Family Markets. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Olson, Dillon)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall have an extension of time through and including October 8, 2021 to file a response to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 09/30/2021. (jl)
September 30, 2021 Filing 16 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Defendants Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Ridley's Family Markets. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Olson, Dillon)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/17/2021. (reb)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 9/15/2021. (tlc)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert C. Evans for Cincinnati Insurance Company,Robert C. Evans for LBG Ogden Five Points.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 9/16/2021. (reb)
September 15, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert C. Evans , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4112728,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiffs Cincinnati Insurance Company, LBG Ogden Five Points. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rippa, Anthony)
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 CLERKS ORDER signed by Anne W. Morgan, Answer deadline updated for Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company answer due 9/30/2021; Ridley's Family Markets answer due 9/30/2021. (reb)
September 15, 2021 Filing 10 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Defendants Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Ridley's Family Markets. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Olson, Dillon)
September 14, 2021 Filing 9 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
September 14, 2021 Filing 8 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs Cincinnati Insurance Company, LBG Ogden Five Points. (alf)
September 13, 2021 Filing 7 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Ridley's Family Markets. (alf)
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv, for Plaintiffs Cincinnati Insurance Company, LBG Ogden Five Points (nmt)
September 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Cincinnati Insurance Company, LBG Ogden Five Points, Defendants Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Ridley's Family Markets. Form due by 9/27/2021. (alf)
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 File downloaded from 2nd District, Weber County Web Xchange consisting of Docket Sheet, Complaint, Returns of Service, Notice of Removal and all applicable state court returns. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Complaint Return of Electronic Notification, #3 Return of Service Liberty Mutual, #4 Return of Service Ridley, #5 Returns of Service Return of Electronic Notification, #6 Notice of Removal, #7 Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification) (alf)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Cincinnati Insurance Company, LBG Ogden Five Points, Defendants Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Ridley's Family Markets. (nmt)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 2nd District Court Weber County, case number 210904196, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4106585) filed by Ridley's Family Markets, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Olson, Dillon)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Defendants Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Ridley's Family Markets is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LBG Ogden Five Points et al v. Ridley's Family Markets et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LBG Ogden Five Points doing business as Westerra Realty & Management
Represented By: Anthony V. Rippa
Represented By: Robert C. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Anthony V. Rippa
Represented By: Robert C. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ridley's Family Markets
Represented By: Douglas P. Farr
Represented By: Dillon P. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglas P. Farr
Represented By: Dillon P. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?