V. et al v. United HealthCare Oxford et al
Plaintiff: E. V. and L. V.
Defendant: United HealthCare Oxford and United Behavorial Health
Case Number: 1:2021cv00126
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 11/5/21. (ss)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Robert C. Deegan, for Defendants United Behavorial Health, United HealthCare Oxford. (alf)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendants United Behavorial Health, United HealthCare Oxford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline for Responses to Complaint) Attorney Maralyn M. English added to party United Behavorial Health(pty:dft), Attorney Maralyn M. English added to party United HealthCare Oxford(pty:dft)(English, Maralyn)
October 14, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by E. V., L. V. as to United HealthCare Oxford Waiver sent on 9/13/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (King, Brian)
October 13, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by E. V., L. V. as to United Behavorial Health Waiver sent on 9/13/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (King, Brian)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against United Behavorial Health, United HealthCare Oxford (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4107175) filed by E. V., L. V.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (King, Brian)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiffs E. V., L. V. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: V. et al v. United HealthCare Oxford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. V.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Samuel Martin Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. V.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Samuel Martin Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Oxford
Represented By: Maralyn M. English
Represented By: Rebecca R. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Behavorial Health
Represented By: Maralyn M. English
Represented By: Rebecca R. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?