Hyper Ice v. iFit
Counter Defendant: Hyper Ice
Counter Claimant: iFit
Case Number: 1:2021cv00150
Filed: November 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Referring Judge: Daphne A Oberg
2 Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 0271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DOCKET TEXT ORDER: The parties are ORDERED to comply with #7 Paragraph 2 of the Order to Propose Schedule within fourteen (14) days. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 1/12/2022. (eh)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. So ordered by Judge Tena Campbell on 1/11/22 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
January 10, 2022 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Hyper Ice filed by iFit.(Wright, Taylor)
January 6, 2022 Filing 24 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
January 5, 2022 Filing 23 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant iFit. (alf)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brian G. Arnold for Hyper Ice.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 12/30/2021. (jl)
December 29, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian G. Arnold , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4205760,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Hyper Ice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Brian G. Arnold)(Smith, Douglas)
December 29, 2021 Filing 20 RECEIVED Resubmission Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Hyper Ice. (mh)
December 29, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #12 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (mh)
December 23, 2021 Filing 18 CLERKS ORDER Granting #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File signed by Anne Morgan. iFIT's deadline to answer, reply, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended by 14 days. iFIT's deadline will be January 10, 2022. (jl)
December 23, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time answer/reply/otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint filed by Defendant iFit. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wright, Taylor) Modified by correcting event on 12/23/2021 (jl).
December 16, 2021 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant iFit identifying iFIT Health & Fitness Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Wright, Taylor)
December 16, 2021 Filing 15 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Hyper Ice. (alf)
December 16, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re 13 Request. The document is stricken as improperly filed. Per instruction on form, these are not to be e-filed, but emailed to Consent Clerk. The attachment has been deleted. Please do not refile. (alf)
December 15, 2021 Filing 13 REQUEST for Reassignment filed by Plaintiff Hyper Ice. (Smith, Douglas),/s> Modified on 12/16/2021 - stricken as improperly filed (alf).
December 10, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Hyper Ice, Defendant iFit. Form due by 12/27/2021. (alf)
December 9, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor J. Wright on behalf of iFit (Wright, Taylor)
December 9, 2021 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hyper Ice as to iFit served on 12/6/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Smith, Douglas)
December 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #8 Return of Service. The document is stricken as improperly filed. Document needs to be refiled using event "Summons Returned Executed". The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (alf)
December 6, 2021 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Personal served on Eric Davis (Legal Clerk for iFit, Inc.) on 12/06/2021, filed by Plaintiff Hyper Ice. (Smith, Douglas) Modified on 12/9/2021 - stricken as improperly filed (alf).
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 11/16/21. (alf)
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Hyper Ice. (Smith, Douglas)
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to iFit. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mh)
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney BRIAN G. ARNOLD, JONATHAN S. PINK and LAWRENCE R. LAPORTE, for Plaintiff Hyper Ice. (mh)
November 15, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against iFit (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4165142) filed by Hyper Ice. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Smith, Douglas)
November 15, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiff Hyper Ice is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyper Ice v. iFit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Hyper Ice
Represented By: Douglas C. Smith
Represented By: Brian G. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: iFit
Represented By: Taylor J. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?