Brown v. Griggs et al
Plaintiff: Mikel Brown and Mikel Ray Brown
Defendant: Darrell Griggs, Seth Dalton, Greg Holley, Wade Breur, Roger Daniels, Ernest Peterson and Utah Highway Patrol
Case Number: 1:2022cv00091
Filed: July 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Referring Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint on or before September 14, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 08/24/2022. (mh)
August 23, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Wade Breur, Seth Dalton, Roger Daniels, Darrell Griggs, Greg Holley, Ernest Peterson, Utah Highway Patrol. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Kaiser, Kyle)
August 9, 2022 Filing 20 The deadline for submission of Consent/Reassignment Form has now passed. The form was not submitted, therefore the case is ineligible for magistrate assignment. Case randomly assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero as (b)(1)(B) referral judge. Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned to the case as presider. (alf)
August 3, 2022 Filing 19 CLERKS ORDER of Extending Answer Deadline re #1 Complaint signed by Tiffany Brown for Gary Serdar, Acting Clerk of Court. Answer deadline updated for all defendants to 8/24/2022. (alf)
August 3, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendants Wade Breur, Seth Dalton, Roger Daniels, Darrell Griggs, Greg Holley, Ernest Peterson, Utah Highway Patrol. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Kyle J. Kaiser added to party Wade Breur(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle J. Kaiser added to party Seth Dalton(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle J. Kaiser added to party Roger Daniels(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle J. Kaiser added to party Darrell Griggs(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle J. Kaiser added to party Greg Holley(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle J. Kaiser added to party Ernest Peterson(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle J. Kaiser added to party Utah Highway Patrol(pty:dft)(Kaiser, Kyle)
July 22, 2022 Filing 17 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mikel Ray Brown as to Roger Daniels served on 7/20/2022, answer due 8/10/2022. (jl)
July 22, 2022 Filing 16 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mikel Ray Brown as to Greg Holley served on 7/20/2022, answer due 8/10/2022. (jl)
July 22, 2022 Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mikel Ray Brown as to Seth Dalton served on 7/20/2022, answer due 8/10/2022. (jl)
July 22, 2022 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mikel Ray Brown as to Wade Breur served on 7/20/2022, answer due 8/10/2022. (jl)
July 22, 2022 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mikel Ray Brown as to Utah Highway Patrol served on 7/20/2022, answer due 8/10/2022. (jl)
July 22, 2022 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mikel Ray Brown as to Ernest Peterson served on 7/20/2022, answer due 8/10/2022. (jl)
July 22, 2022 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mikel Ray Brown as to Darrell Griggs served on 7/21/2022, answer due 8/11/2022. (jl)
July 19, 2022 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Roger Daniels. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
July 19, 2022 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Greg Holley. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
July 19, 2022 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Seth Dalton. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
July 19, 2022 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Wade Breur. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
July 19, 2022 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Utah Highway Patrol. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
July 19, 2022 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Ernest Peterson. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
July 19, 2022 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Darrell Griggs. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
July 19, 2022 Filing 3 ERRATA to #1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Mikel Brown. Complaint with signed signature page. (jl)
July 18, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE to Plaintiff - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return #the form on this link To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not file the Consent Form in the case.Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Mikel Brown. Form due by 8/8/2022. (mh)
July 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 4681099318) (Fee Status: Paid) filed by Mikel Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Griggs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikel Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikel Ray Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Griggs
Represented By: Kyle J. Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Dalton
Represented By: Kyle J. Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Holley
Represented By: Kyle J. Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade Breur
Represented By: Kyle J. Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Daniels
Represented By: Kyle J. Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Peterson
Represented By: Kyle J. Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah Highway Patrol
Represented By: Kyle J. Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?