American United Life Insurance v. SKCSS Family Trust of 2004 et al
Plaintiff: American United Life Insurance
Defendant: SKCSS Family Trust of 2004 and Corey L. Johnson
Case Number: 1:2022cv00141
Filed: October 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint for Interpleader filed by Corey L. Johnson. Attorney Lane V. Erickson added to party Corey L. Johnson(pty:dft)(Erickson, Lane)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint for Interpleader filed by Corey L. Johnson. Attorney Daniel C. Green added to party Corey L. Johnson(pty:dft)(Green, Daniel)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by American United Life Insurance as to Corey L. Johnson Waiver sent on 10/27/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Sweeney, Scott)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one (21) days after any defendant has been served or any defendant has appeared, unless any party is appearing pro se. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/20/2022. (alf)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Interpleader and Other Equitable and Declaratory Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4480171) filed by American United Life Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint for Interpleader, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint for Interpleader, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint for Interpleader, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Complaint for Interpleader, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Complaint for Interpleader, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F to Complaint for Interpleader, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Sweeney, Scott)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff American United Life Insurance is directed to E-File the complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (haa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American United Life Insurance v. SKCSS Family Trust of 2004 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American United Life Insurance
Represented By: Scott D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SKCSS Family Trust of 2004
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey L. Johnson
Represented By: Daniel C. Green
Represented By: Lane V. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?