BSJ Travel v. Ogden City Airport et al
Plaintiff: BSJ Travel
Defendant: Ogden City Airport, Ogden City, Gary Williams, Brayant Garrett and Bryant Garrett
Case Number: 1:2022cv00156
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A Kimball
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Stipulated Motion to File Amended Complaint and for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond. Plaintiffs shall have until February 1, 2023 in which to file an amended complaint. Defendants shall have 30 days to respond. Should Plaintiffs not file an amended complaint, Defendants' response to the original Complaint shall be due no later than February 15, 2023. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 1/12/2023. (eat)
January 11, 2023 Filing 20 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time Amendment of Complaint and Answer to Complaint filed by Plaintiff BSJ Travel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bednar, Richard)
December 20, 2022 Filing 19 RESPONSE re #18 Response (NOT to motion),Defendants' Notice and Correction of Pleading Deadlines filed by Bryant Garrett, Ogden City, Ogden City Airport, Gary Williams. (Noel, Stephen)
December 2, 2022 Filing 18 Amended RESPONSE re #16 Status Report, filed by Bryant Garrett, Ogden City, Ogden City Airport, Gary Williams. (Noel, Stephen)
December 2, 2022 Filing 17 Defendant's RESPONSE re #16 Status Report, filed by Bryant Garrett, Ogden City, Ogden City Airport, Gary Williams. (Noel, Stephen)
December 1, 2022 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT by BSJ Travel. (Bednar, Richard)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER VACATING EXPEDITED BRIEFING & HEARING SCHEDULE for Plainitff's #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Directing Plaintiff to File Status Update. Defendants' #14 Expedited Ex Parte Motion to Vacate Hearing or Continue Hearing and Modify Briefing Schedule is GRANTED. The previously set briefing schedule and hearing date is VACATED, and Plaintiff is directed to file a Status Update by December 1, 2022. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 11/28/2022. (eat)
November 23, 2022 Filing 14 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION to Vacate and Memorandum in Support and Notice of Mootness and Motion to Continue filed by Defendants Bryant Garrett, Ogden City, Ogden City Airport, Gary Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Application and Receipt of Airport Security Badge)(Noel, Stephen)
November 17, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re Plaintiff's #2 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order (Notice generated by DAK Chambers): Motion Hearing is set for 12/13/2022 at 01:30 PM in Rm 3.400 before Judge Dale A. Kimball. (eat)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's #9 Motion to Expedite. The court sets the following briefing schedule: Defendants' Opposition Memorandum: Wednesday, November 30, 2022. Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum: Thursday, December 8, 2022.The court has set aside 2.5 hours for a hearing at 1:30 p.m. on Tuesday, December 13, 2022. The hearing will be held in person unless the parties notify the court that they prefer that the hearing be held on Zoom. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 11/17/2022. (eat)
November 16, 2022 Filing 11 Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 Plaintiff's MOTION to Expedite Briefing and/or Hearing and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Bryant Garrett, Ogden City, Ogden City Airport, Gary Williams. (Noel, Stephen)
November 16, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen F. Noel on behalf of Bryant Garrett, Ogden City, Ogden City Airport, Gary Williams (Noel, Stephen)
November 16, 2022 Filing 9 Plaintiff's MOTION to Expedite Briefing and/or Hearing and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff BSJ Travel. (Bednar, Richard)
November 16, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by BSJ Travel as to All Defendants. (Bednar, Richard)
November 16, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bryant Garrett. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (ks)
November 16, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Gary Williams. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (ks)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Re: Procedures for #2 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order filed by BSJ Travel. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 11/15/2022. (eat)
November 15, 2022 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance, filed by BSJ Travel. (Bednar, Richard)
November 15, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #1 Complaint. The document Civil Cover Sheet is Missing. All Civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule DUCivR3-4. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet JS44 immediately. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (ks)
November 15, 2022 Judge Dale A. Kimball added. Case number will now read 1:22-CV-00156-DAK. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (ks)
November 14, 2022 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff BSJ Travel, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email Correspondence, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Douglas M. Durbano, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bednar, Richard) Douglas M. Durbano. Added MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order on 11/15/2022 (jwt). Modified on 11/15/2022 to reflect correct attorney (ks).
November 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order to be filed separately against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4505323) filed by BSJ Travel, Inc. (*Restricted*Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Badge Application)) (Bednar, Richard) Douglas M Durbano Modified on 11/15/2022 Exhibit 1 moved to Restricted Access only to case participants to comply with FedCivR 5.2 Privacy (nl). Modified on 11/15/2022 to reflect the correct attorney(ks).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BSJ Travel v. Ogden City Airport et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BSJ Travel
Represented By: Steven H. Bergman
Represented By: Richard A. Bednar
Represented By: Douglas M Durbano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ogden City Airport
Represented By: Stephen F. Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ogden City
Represented By: Stephen F. Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Williams
Represented By: Stephen F. Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brayant Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant Garrett
Represented By: Stephen F. Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?