Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Badali et al
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Renata Ann Badali, Ashley Badali, Rachel Badali, Sabrina Badali, Diann Badali, Renata Ann Deveraux, Ashley D. Badali, Ashley Diann Badali, Rachel Liliann Badali, Sabrina M. Badali, Sabrina Mary Badali, Sabrina Mary Ann Badali and George Graff
Case Number: 1:2022cv00158
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company as to Diann Badali Waiver sent on 11/15/2022, answer due 1/17/2023. (Perkins, Leslie)
December 23, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ERROR re #5 Waiver of Service Executed, Acknowledgment of Service, #6 Waiver of Service Executed, Acknowledgment of Service, #7 Waiver of Service Executed, Acknowledgment of Service, #8 Acknowledgment of Service. Documents 5-7 were filed using two different filing events and document 9 was filed using the wrong filing event - a waiver of service executed should be filed using only the "Waiver of Service Executed" filing event so that the system prompts for and sets only the one correct Answer Deadline for a party. Any summons or waivers of summons executed should be filed using only a single filing event. The clerk will edit entries 5-7 to remove incorrectly added second filing event text and requests the filer of the original document #8 to refile using only the "Waiver of Service Executed" filing event. The new entry will receive a new document number on the docket. (alt)
December 23, 2022 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #2 Complaint, Diann Badali, Acknowledgment filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.Diann Badali served on 12/21/2022, answer due 1/11/2023. (Perkins, Leslie)
December 8, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company as to Ashley Badali Waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023; Rachel Badali Waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023; Sabrina Badali Waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023. (Perkins, Leslie) Modified on 12/23/2022: removed incorrectly added Acknowledgement of Service text from entry (alt)
December 8, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company as to Renata Ann Badali Waiver sent on 11/21/2022, answer due 1/20/2023. (Perkins, Leslie) Modified on 12/23/2022: removed incorrectly added Acknowledgement of Service text from entry (alt)
December 8, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company as to George Graff Waiver sent on 11/15/2022, answer due 1/17/2023. (Perkins, Leslie) Modified on 12/23/2022: removed incorrectly added Acknowledgement of Service text from entry (alt)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 12/5/2022. (alf)
November 15, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Metlife, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Perkins, Leslie)
November 15, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Interpleader against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4506363) filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Insurance, #2 Exhibit B - Death Certificate, #3 Exhibit C - D. Badali Life Insurance Claim, #4 Exhibit D - Dorrespondence from D. Badali, #5 Exhibit E - R. A. Badali Life Insurance Claim, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Perkins, Leslie)
November 15, 2022 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company is directed to E-File the complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (haa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Badali et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renata Ann Badali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Badali
Represented By: Zane S. Froerer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Badali
Represented By: Zane S. Froerer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabrina Badali
Represented By: Zane S. Froerer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diann Badali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renata Ann Deveraux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley D. Badali
Represented By: Zane S. Froerer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Diann Badali
Represented By: Zane S. Froerer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Liliann Badali
Represented By: Zane S. Froerer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabrina M. Badali
Represented By: Zane S. Froerer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabrina Mary Badali
Represented By: Zane S. Froerer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabrina Mary Ann Badali
Represented By: Zane S. Froerer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Graff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Leslie M. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?