Brown v. Jantzen et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Christian Brown
Defendant: Matthew B. Jantzen, Benjamin B. Wilbughby, Troy S. Rawlings, David J. Williams, CJ Evans and Benjamin B. Wilboughby
Case Number: 1:2024cv00058
Filed: April 8, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A Kimball
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Matthew B. Jantzen, Troy S. Rawlings, Benjamin B. Wilboughby. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Hamilton, R.)
May 6, 2024 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Kelly Christian Brown. (eat)
May 3, 2024 Filing 15 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of a document re: An Authenticated Foreign Document Hague Convenction, 5 October 1961. Affidavit for Public Notice, Honorable Clarifcations Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(kpf)
May 2, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Kelly Christian Brown. (Notice generated by Clerk's Office) Form due by 5/23/2024. (mh)
May 1, 2024 Filing 13 RECEIVED Magistrate Availability Form from Defendants Matthew B. Jantzen, Troy S. Rawlings, Benjamin B. Wilboughby. (mh)
April 29, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants CJ Evans, David J. Williams. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Chesnut, Heather)
April 18, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Email Filing and Notification Form by Kelly Christian Brown (kpf)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Defendants CJ Evans and David J. Williams: answer/response due by 4/29/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 4/11/2024. (eat)
April 11, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Notice of Removal, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants CJ Evans, David J. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Chesnut, Heather)
April 10, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Matthew B. Jantzen, Troy S. Rawlings, Benjamin B. Wilbughby. Counsel corrected and notice resent. (Notice generated by Clerk's Office) Form due by 5/1/2024. (mh)
April 9, 2024 Filing 6 RECEIVED Magistrate Availability Form from Defendants CJ Evans and David J. Williams. (mh)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate Judge to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 4/9/2024. (eat)
April 8, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) with Jury Demand filed by Matthew B. Jantzen, Troy S. Rawlings, Benjamin B. Wilbughby. (mh)
April 8, 2024 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CJ Evans, David J. Williams re #2 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #2 Exhibit A Part 1 to Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #3 Exhibit A Part 2 to Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #4 Exhibit A Part 3 to Notice of Removal to Federal Court)(Chesnut, Heather)
April 8, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants CJ Evans, Matthew B. Jantzen, Troy S. Rawlings, Benjamin B. Wilbughby, David J. Williams. (Notice generated by Clerk's office) Form due by 4/29/2024. (kec)
April 8, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 2nd District Court Davis County, case number 240700262, (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5025381) filed by David J. Williams, CJ Evans. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint with Exhibits, #3 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit State Court Notice of Event Due Dates, #5 Exhibit Complete State Court Case Docket) (Chesnut, Heather)
April 8, 2024 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Defendants CJ Evans, Matthew B. Jantzen, Troy S. Rawlings, Benjamin B. Wilbughby, David J. Williams is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and civil cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 405 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (kec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Jantzen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Christian Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew B. Jantzen
Represented By: Heather J. Chesnut
Represented By: Sean D. Reyes
Represented By: Janise Kekauoha Macanas
Represented By: R. Blake Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin B. Wilbughby
Represented By: Heather J. Chesnut
Represented By: Sean D. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy S. Rawlings
Represented By: Heather J. Chesnut
Represented By: Sean D. Reyes
Represented By: Janise Kekauoha Macanas
Represented By: R. Blake Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Williams
Represented By: Heather J. Chesnut
Represented By: Sean D. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CJ Evans
Represented By: Heather J. Chesnut
Represented By: Sean D. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin B. Wilboughby
Represented By: Janise Kekauoha Macanas
Represented By: R. Blake Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?