Stichting Mayflower v. Pk Cty, et al
Case Number: 2:2004cv00925
Filed: October 1, 2004
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
Presiding Judge: Paul M. Warner
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 450 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 448 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 3/12/13 (alt)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 447 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 441 Motion to Stay ; denying 442 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 01/10/2013. (asp)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 428 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Overruling 413 Stichting Mayflower's Objection to Magistrate Judge's Ruling. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 1/31/2011. (las)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 419 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 408 Motion for Entry of Judgment ; denying 408 Motion for Sanctions; denying 417 Motion to Strike. The Clerk of Court is directed to amend the 3/15/2010 Judgment 375 to include damages in the amount of $1 in favor of UPCM and against the Counterclaim Defendants on UPCM's Counterclaims. The Clerk of Court is direct to close this case forthwith. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 1/13/2011. (las)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER denying 366 Emergency Motion to Strike Orders on Supplemental Proceedings; denying 368 Emergency Motion to Strike Ruling of Magistrate Judge; denying 371 Motion to Strike Emergency Motions. The Clerk of Court shall amend the November 13, 2009 Clerk's Judgment to clarify the nature of the judgment and the amounts awarded to defendants. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 3-15-10. (sih)
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 277 AMENDED ORDER re 271 MOTION to Stay filed by Stichting Mayflower Recreational Fonds and Stichting Mayflower Mountain Fonds, Stichting Beheer Mayflower Project. Court's Order 276 is amended to correct date by which Stichting parties were req uired to comply with court's discovery orders. The court's prior March 23, 2009 Order set the deadline as April 23, 2009. The court's Order 276 is amended to reflect April 23, 2009, rather than April 30, 2009 stated in Order 276 . Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 4-23-09. (sih)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER denying 259 Motion to Disqualify Judge. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 3/23/09. (jwt)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER denying 249 Motion to Clarify; denying without prejudice 251 Motion for Sanctions. Motion for Sanctions may be refiled if Counterclaim Defendants are not complying with court's discovery orders as of March 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 2:04cv925. (sih)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER AFFIRMING Magistrate 237 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct and Extending Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 1/13/09. (jwt)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER denying 214 Motion to Amend/Supplement Counterclaim on grounds that proposed counterclaim is not yet ripe. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 10-8-08. (sih)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stichting Mayflower v. Pk Cty, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?