Kings English, The et al v. Shurtleff et al Featured Case

Utah bookstores, artistic and informative websites, Internet service providers and national trade associations challenged of state law restricting children's access to material on the Internet.

Plaintiff: Kings English, The, Sam Wellers Zion Bookstore, Nathan Florence, W. Andrew McCullough, Sexual Health Network, The, Utah Progressive Network Education Fund, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union, Association of American Publishers, Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund, Freedom to Read Foundation, Publishers Marketing Association, IPNS of Utah and Rigidtech.com
Defendant: Mark Shurtleff, Von J. Christiansen, N. George Daines, Gene Strate, Karen Allen, David A. Blackwell, Happy J. Morgan, Scott F. Garrett, Jared W. Eldridge, Marvin D. Bagley, George W. Preston, Craig C. Halls, Ross C. Blackham, David Brickey, Joann Stringham, Thomas L. Low, Brock R. Belnap, Mark Decaria, Stephen Hadfield, Bryan Sidwell, Troy Rawlings, Stephen Foote, Barry L. Huntington, John E. Hummel, Richard Waddingham, Jann L. Farris, Lohra L. Miller, Dale Eyre, Douglas Hogan and Jeffrey Buhman
Case Number: 2:2005cv00485
Filed: June 9, 2005
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Samuel Alba
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Shurtleff Defendant's Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' Amended First Set of Interrogatories (Jensen, Jerrold)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Shurtleff Defendants' Answers to Plaintiffs' Amended First Set of Interrogatories and Defendants' Answers to Plaintiffs' Amended Requests for Production of Documents (Jensen, Jerrold)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Shurtleff Plaintiffs' Amended First Set of Requests for Admission (Jensen, Jerrold)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ANSWER to 43 Amended Complaint,,,,,, filed by Mark Shurtleff.(Jensen, Jerrold)
August 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 64 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; denying 66 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 8/8/2008. (rlr)
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Dee Benson: After arguments were heard and discussion held, Crt took the motion for leave to file a second amended complaint under advisement. Written Order to follow oral order: y. Court Reporter: Ed Young. (reb)
June 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Motions No Longer Referred: 68 MOTION To Lift Injunction Against Utah Code Ann. §§ 76-10-1205 and 1231, 64 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint or For Reconsideration, 66 MOTION Reconsideration. Judge Benson has a hearing set on these motions 7/28/08. (ss)
May 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: 64 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint or For Reconsideration : (Notice generated by chambers) Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2008 02:30 PM in Room 246 before Judge Dee Benson. (reb)
May 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REPLY to Response to Motion re 64 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint or For Reconsideration filed by Plaintiffs W. Andrew McCullough, Sexual Health Network, The, IPNS of Utah, Utah Progressive Network Education Fund, Rigidtech.com, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union, Kings English, The, Association of American Publishers, Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund, Freedom to Read Foundation, Publishers Marketing Association, Sam Wellers Zion Bookstore, Nathan Florence. (Weyher, Zachary)
May 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 69 RESPONSE to Motion re 68 MOTION To Lift Injunction Against Utah Code Ann. §§ 76-10-1205 and 1231 filed by Plaintiffs W. Andrew McCullough, Sexual Health Network, The, IPNS of Utah, Utah Progressive Network Education Fund, Rigidtech.com, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union, Kings English, The, Association of American Publishers, Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund, Freedom to Read Foundation, Publishers Marketing Association, Sam Wellers Zion Bookstore, Nathan Florence. (Weyher, Zachary)
April 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION To Lift Injunction Against Utah Code Ann. §§ 76-10-1205 and 1231 filed by Defendants Stephen Hadfield, Bryan Sidwell, Troy Rawlings, Stephen Foote, Barry L. Huntington, John E. Hummel, Richard Waddingham, Jann L. Farris, Lohra L. Miller, Dale Eyre, Douglas Hogan, Jeffrey Buhman, Mark Shurtleff, Von J. Christiansen, N. George Daines, Gene Strate, Karen Allen, David A. Blackwell, Happy J. Morgan, Scott F. Garrett, Jared W. Eldridge, Marvin D. Bagley, George W. Preston, Craig C. Halls, Ross C. Blackham, David Brickey, Joann Stringham, Thomas L. Low, Brock R. Belnap, Mark Decaria. Motions referred to Samuel Alba.(Jensen, Jerrold)
April 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 67 RESPONSE to Motion re 64 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint or For Reconsideration, 66 MOTION Reconsideration filed by Defendants Stephen Hadfield, Bryan Sidwell, Troy Rawlings, Stephen Foote, Barry L. Huntington, John E. Hummel, Richard Waddingham, Jann L. Farris, Lohra L. Miller, Dale Eyre, Douglas Hogan, Jeffrey Buhman, Mark Shurtleff, Von J. Christiansen, N. George Daines, Gene Strate, Karen Allen, David A. Blackwell, Happy J. Morgan, Scott F. Garrett, Jared W. Eldridge, Marvin D. Bagley, George W. Preston, Craig C. Halls, Ross C. Blackham, David Brickey, Joann Stringham, Thomas L. Low, Brock R. Belnap, Mark Decaria. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Jensen, Jerrold)
February 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Plaintiffs W. Andrew McCullough, Sexual Health Network, The, IPNS of Utah, Utah Progressive Network Education Fund, Rigidtech.com, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union, Kings English, The, Association of American Publishers, Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund, Freedom to Read Foundation, Publishers Marketing Association, Sam Wellers Zion Bookstore, Nathan Florence. Motions referred to Samuel Alba. NOTE: This is a combination document, see entry 64 for the image.(rlr)
February 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM in Support re 64 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint or 66 For Reconsideration filed by Plaintiffs W. Andrew McCullough, Sexual Health Network, The, IPNS of Utah, Utah Progressive Network Education Fund, Rigidtech.com, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union, Kings English, The, Association of American Publishers, Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund, Freedom to Read Foundation, Publishers Marketing Association, Sam Wellers Zion Bookstore, Nathan Florence. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 2nd Amended Complaint, # 3 Appendix A to 2nd Amended Complaint, # 4 Appendix B to 2nd Amended Complaint)(Weyher, Zachary) Modified on 2/19/2008 - Added docket relationship to entry 66 (rlr).
February 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint or For Reconsideration filed by Plaintiffs W. Andrew McCullough, Sexual Health Network, The, IPNS of Utah, Utah Progressive Network Education Fund, Rigidtech.com, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union, Kings English, The, Association of American Publishers, Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund, Freedom to Read Foundation, Publishers Marketing Association, Sam Wellers Zion Bookstore, Nathan Florence. Motions referred to Samuel Alba.(Weyher, Zachary)
November 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 11/28/2007. (rlr)
October 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Dee Benson : Cnsl present. After arguments were heard and discussion held, Crt ruled: Taking the motion to dismiss under advisement. Cnsl thanked and excused. taking under advisement 48 Motion to Dismiss ; Motion Hearing held on 10/25/2007 re 48 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Jeffrey Buhman, Mark Shurtleff, Gene Strate, Von J. Christiansen, Bryan Sidwell, N. George Daines, Barry L. Huntington, Happy J. Morgan, George W. Preston, Ross C. Blackham, Richard Waddingham, Craig C. Halls, John E. Hummel, Dale Eyre, Stephen Foote, Stephen Hadfield, Joann Stringham, Brock R. Belnap, David A. Blackwell, Jared W. Eldridge, Douglas Hogan, Thomas L. Low, Karen Allen, Troy Rawlings, Jann L. Farris, Lohra L. Miller, Mark Decaria, Marvin D. Bagley, David Brickey, Scott F. Garrett. Written Order to follow oral order: Y.Attorney for Plaintiff: M. Bamberger, W. Felix, M. Lowe, J. Morris, Attorney for Defendant M. Burns and J. Jenson. Court Reporter: Ed Young. (reb)
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: 48 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint : (Notice generated by Chambers) Motion Hearing reset for 10/25/2007 02:30 PM before Judge Dee Benson. (asp)
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 59 Motion to continue. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 09/06/2007. (asp)
September 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Joint MOTION Motion for entry of stipulated order filed by Plaintiffs W. Andrew McCullough, Sexual Health Network, The, IPNS of Utah, Utah Progressive Network Education Fund, Rigidtech.com, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union, Kings English, The, Association of American Publishers, Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund, Freedom to Read Foundation, Publishers Marketing Association, Sam Wellers Zion Bookstore, Nathan Florence. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Samuel Alba.(Lowe, Marina)
August 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: 48 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint : (Notice generated by chambers) Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2007 02:30 PM in Room 246 before Judge Dee Benson. (reb)
August 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 55 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting 56 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 8/1/07. (blk)
August 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Defendants Stephen Hadfield, Bryan Sidwell, Troy Rawlings, Stephen Foote, Barry L. Huntington, John E. Hummel, Richard Waddingham, Jann L. Farris, Lohra L. Miller, Dale Eyre, Douglas Hogan, Jeffrey Buhman, Mark Shurtleff, Von J. Christiansen, N. George Daines, Gene Strate, Karen Allen, David A. Blackwell, Happy J. Morgan, Scott F. Garrett, Jared W. Eldridge, Marvin D. Bagley, George W. Preston, Craig C. Halls, Ross C. Blackham, David Brickey, Joann Stringham, Thomas L. Low, Brock R. Belnap, Mark Decaria. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Samuel Alba.(Burns, Mark)
August 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Defendants Stephen Hadfield, Bryan Sidwell, Troy Rawlings, Stephen Foote, Barry L. Huntington, John E. Hummel, Richard Waddingham, Jann L. Farris, Lohra L. Miller, Dale Eyre, Douglas Hogan, Jeffrey Buhman, Mark Shurtleff, Von J. Christiansen, N. George Daines, Gene Strate, Karen Allen, David A. Blackwell, Happy J. Morgan, Scott F. Garrett, Jared W. Eldridge, Marvin D. Bagley, George W. Preston, Craig C. Halls, Ross C. Blackham, David Brickey, Joann Stringham, Thomas L. Low, Brock R. Belnap, Mark Decaria. Motions referred to Samuel Alba.(Burns, Mark)
August 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REPLY to Response to Motion re 48 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Stephen Hadfield, Bryan Sidwell, Troy Rawlings, Stephen Foote, Barry L. Huntington, John E. Hummel, Richard Waddingham, Jann L. Farris, Lohra L. Miller, Dale Eyre, Douglas Hogan, Jeffrey Buhman, Mark Shurtleff, Von J. Christiansen, N. George Daines, Gene Strate, Karen Allen, David A. Blackwell, Happy J. Morgan, Scott F. Garrett, Jared W. Eldridge, Marvin D. Bagley, George W. Preston, Craig C. Halls, Ross C. Blackham, David Brickey, Joann Stringham, Thomas L. Low, Brock R. Belnap, Mark Decaria, Plaintiff Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund. (Burns, Mark)
July 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 48 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs W. Andrew McCullough, Computer Solutions International, Mountain Wireless Utah, Sexual Health Network, The, IPNS of Utah, Utah Progressive Network Education Fund, Rigidtech.com, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union, Kings English, The, Association of American Publishers, Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund, Freedom to Read Foundation, Publishers Marketing Association, Sam Wellers Zion Bookstore, Nathan Florence. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A# 2 Appendix B)(Weyher, Zachary)
June 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Marina B. Lowe replacing Margaret D. Plane as counsel on behalf of W. Andrew McCullough, Sexual Health Network, The, IPNS of Utah, Utah Progressive Network Education Fund, Rigidtech.com, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union, Kings English, The, Association of American Publishers, Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund, Freedom to Read Foundation, Publishers Marketing Association, Sam Wellers Zion Bookstore, Nathan Florence. (Lowe, Marina)
June 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 50 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 06/04/2007. (asp)
May 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Defendants Stephen Hadfield, Bryan Sidwell, Troy Rawlings, Stephen Foote, Barry L. Huntington, John E. Hummel, Richard Waddingham, Jann L. Farris, Lohra L. Miller, Dale Eyre, Douglas Hogan, Jeffrey Buhman, Mark Shurtleff, Von J. Christiansen, N. George Daines, Gene Strate, Karen Allen, David A. Blackwell, Happy J. Morgan, Scott F. Garrett, Jared W. Eldridge, Marvin D. Bagley, George W. Preston, Craig C. Halls, Ross C. Blackham, David Brickey, Joann Stringham, Thomas L. Low, Brock R. Belnap, Mark Decaria. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Samuel Alba.(Jensen, Jerrold)
May 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM in Support re 48 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Stephen Hadfield, Bryan Sidwell, Troy Rawlings, Stephen Foote, Barry L. Huntington, John E. Hummel, Richard Waddingham, Jann L. Farris, Lohra L. Miller, Dale Eyre, Douglas Hogan, Jeffrey Buhman, Mark Shurtleff, Von J. Christiansen, N. George Daines, Gene Strate, Karen Allen, David A. Blackwell, Happy J. Morgan, Scott F. Garrett, Jared W. Eldridge, Marvin D. Bagley, George W. Preston, Ross C. Blackham, David Brickey, Joann Stringham, Thomas L. Low, Brock R. Belnap, Mark Decaria. (Jensen, Jerrold)
May 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Stephen Hadfield, Bryan Sidwell, Troy Rawlings, Stephen Foote, Barry L. Huntington, John E. Hummel, Richard Waddingham, Jann L. Farris, Lohra L. Miller, Dale Eyre, Douglas Hogan, Jeffrey Buhman, Mark Shurtleff, Von J. Christiansen, N. George Daines, Gene Strate, Karen Allen, David A. Blackwell, Happy J. Morgan, Scott F. Garrett, Jared W. Eldridge, Marvin D. Bagley, George W. Preston, Craig C. Halls, Ross C. Blackham, David Brickey, Joann Stringham, Thomas L. Low, Brock R. Belnap, Mark Decaria. (Jensen, Jerrold)
May 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 44 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Samuel Alba on 5/3/07. (kla)
May 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E. Burns on behalf of all defendants (Burns, Mark)
May 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by W. Andrew McCullough, Computer Solutions International, Mountain Wireless Utah, Sexual Health Network, The, Utah Progressive Network Education Fund, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union, Kings English, The, Association of American Publishers, Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund, Freedom to Read Foundation, Publishers Marketing Association, Sam Wellers Zion Bookstore, Nathan Florence re 43 Amended Complaint,,,,,, (Felix, Wesley)
April 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs W. Andrew McCullough, Computer Solutions International, Mountain Wireless Utah, Sexual Health Network, The, Utah Progressive Network Education Fund, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union, Kings English, The, Association of American Publishers, Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund, Freedom to Read Foundation, Publishers Marketing Association, Sam Wellers Zion Bookstore, Nathan Florence. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Samuel Alba.(Weyher, Zachary)
April 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 43 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mark Shurtleff, Von J. Christiansen, Amy F. Hugie, N. George Daines, Gene Strate, Dennis Judd, Melvin C. Wilson, Karen Allen, David A. Blackwell, Wallace A. Lee, Happy J. Morgan, Scott F. Garrett, Jared W. Eldridge, Eric S. Lind, Leray Jackson, Kelly M. Wright, Marvin D. Bagley, George W. Preston, David Yocom, Craig C. Halls, Ross C. Blackham, R. Don Brown, David Brickey, Douglas J. Ahlstrom, Joann Stringham, Carlisle Kay Bryson, Thomas L. Low, Brock R. Belnap, Mark Decaria. New Plaintiffs: IPNS of Utah, LLC; Rigidtech.com,Inc.. Removed Plaintiffs: Computer Solutions International, Inc.; Mountian Wireless Utah, LLC.. New Defendants: Stephen Hadfield; Brian Sidwell; Troy Rawlings; Stephen Foote; Barry L. Huntington; John E. Hummel; Richard Waddingham; Jann L. Farris; Lohra L. Miller; Dale Eyre; Douglas Hogan; Jeffrey Buhman. Removed Defendants: Amy F. Hugie; Dennis L. Judd; Melvin C. Wilson; Karen Allen; Wallace A. Lee; Eric S. Lind; Leray G. Jackson; Kelly M. Wright; David E. Yocom; R. Don Brown; Douglas J. Ahlstrom; Carlyle Kay Bryson., filed by W. Andrew McCullough, Computer Solutions International, Mountain Wireless Utah, Sexual Health Network, The, Utah Progressive Network Education Fund, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union, Kings English, The, Association of American Publishers, Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund, Freedom to Read Foundation, Publishers Marketing Association, Sam Wellers Zion Bookstore, Nathan Florence.(Felix, Wesley)
April 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Samuel Alba : Status Conference held on 4/3/2007. Counsel updated the court on recent rulings. Counsel have stipulated to the filing of an amended complaint, Court instructed the plaintiffs to file an amended complaint by 4/30/07. Counsel are to submit a proposed order allowing the filing of the amended complaint.Attorney for Plaintiff: Wes Felix, Zach Weyher, Margaret Plane, Michael Bamberger appeared by telephone, Attorney for Defendant Jerrold Jensen, Mark Burns. Court Reporter: Electronic.(Time Start: :00, Time End: 5:53, Room 248.) (ss) Modified on 4/4/2007 (Schaerrer, Stephanie). The date for filing the amended complaint was incorrect.
March 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 41 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING (Notice generated by ss) Status Report and Scheduling Conference reset for 4/3/2007 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Samuel Alba. (ss)
February 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Samuel Alba : Status Conference held on 2/21/2007. Court instructed counsel to meet after the outcome of the legislative session ends and prepare an attorney meeting planning report. Court set the matter for a Scheduling Conference on 3/15/2007 at 09:30 AM. Mr. Morris will be appearing by telephone. He will call in.Attorney for Plaintiff: Wesley D. Felix, John B. Morris, Zachary J. Weyher, Margaret D. Plane, Attorney for Defendant Jerrold Jensen, Mark Burns. Court Reporter: Electronic.(Time Start: :00, Time End: 4:36, Room 436.) (ss)
February 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE OF HEARING Scheduling Conference set for 2/21/2007 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 436 before Magistrate Judge Samuel Alba. (cas)
February 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Samuel Alba under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 02/01/2007. (asp)
January 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REQUEST for Rule 16 Conference filed by Plaintiffs W. Andrew McCullough, Computer Solutions International, Mountain Wireless Utah, Sexual Health Network, The, Utah Progressive Network Education Fund, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union, Kings English, The, Association of American Publishers, Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund, Freedom to Read Foundation, Publishers Marketing Association, Sam Wellers Zion Bookstore, Nathan Florence. (Weyher, Zachary)
August 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Motion for Preliminary Injunction . Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 8/25/06.(asp, )
August 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Defendant's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Entry of Stipulated Order filed by Defendants Mark Shurtleff, Von J. Christiansen, Amy F. Hugie, N. George Daines, Gene Strate, Dennis Judd, Melvin C. Wilson, Karen Allen, David A. Blackwell, Wallace A. Lee, Happy J. Morgan, Scott F. Garrett, Jared W. Eldridge, Eric S. Lind, Leray Jackson, Kelly M. Wright, Marvin D. Bagley, George W. Preston, David Yocom, Craig C. Halls, Ross C. Blackham, R. Don Brown, David Brickey, Douglas J. Ahlstrom, Joann Stringham, Carlisle Kay Bryson, Thomas L. Low, Brock R. Belnap, Mark Decaria. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jensen, Jerrold)
July 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kings English, The of First Interrogatories, Request for Admission, and Request for Production of Documents (Weyher, Zachary)
April 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/15/2006. Joinder of Parties due by 8/1/2006. Discovery due by 10/16/2006. Motions due by 2/28/2007. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2007 02:30 PM in Room 246 before Judge Dee Benson. 9 day Bench Trial set for 7/30/2007 08:30 AM in Room 246 before Judge Dee Benson. (asp, )
April 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 31 Motion for Extension of Time . Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 4/6/06. (asp, )
March 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time re: Dates of Attorney's Planning Report of November 9, 2005 filed by Plaintiff Kings English, The. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Stipulated Order)(Weyher, Zachary) Modified on 3/24/2006 added in re: to docket text (asp, ).
January 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATED ORDER granting 29 Motion until 3/30/06 to respond to dfts Motion to dismiss . Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 1/20/06. (kvs, )
January 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATED MOTION for entry of order extending time for plas to respond to dfts motion to dismiss until 3/30/06 filed by Plaintiffs W. Andrew McCullough, Computer Solutions International, Mountain Wireless Utah, Sexual Health Network, The, Utah Progressive Network Education Fund, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union, Kings English, The, Association of American Publishers, Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund, Freedom to Read Foundation, Publishers Marketing Association, Sam Wellers Zion Bookstore, Nathan Florence, Defendants Mark Shurtleff, Von J. Christiansen, Amy F. Hugie, N. George Daines, Gene Strate, Dennis Judd, Melvin C. Wilson, Karen Allen, David A. Blackwell, Wallace A. Lee, Happy J. Morgan, Scott F. Garrett, Jared W. Eldridge, Eric S. Lind, Leray Jackson, Kelly M. Wright, Marvin D. Bagley, George W. Preston, David Yocom, Craig C. Halls, Ross C. Blackham, R. Don Brown, David Brickey, Douglas J. Ahlstrom, Joann Stringham, Carlisle Kay Bryson, Thomas L. Low, Brock R. Belnap, Mark Decaria. (kvs, )
November 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Nuffer : On November 9, 2005, the parties appeared and entered a conditional stipulation as to the schedule in this case. (Docket no. 23). The schedule was contingent upon the submission of a stipulation of non-enforcement of House Bill 260. A status conference was set for all parties December 6, 2005. The contemplated stipulation has been filed (docket no. 25), obviating the need for the status conference. (asb, )
November 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATED ORDER re 25 MOTION for entry of stipulated order re: agreement between parties filed by Craig C. Halls,, David Yocom,, W. Andrew McCullough,, American Civil Liberties Union,, R. Don Brown,, Gene Strate,, Melvin C. Wilson,, Carlisle Kay Bryson,, Mark Decaria,, Leray Jackson,, Mark Shurtleff,, David Brickey,, Dennis Judd,, Joann Stringham,, Kings English, The,, Sam Wellers Zion Bookstore,, Nathan Florence,, Computer Solutions International,, Mountain Wireless Utah,, Sexual Health Network, The,, Utah Progressive Network Education Fund,, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression,, Association of American Publishers,, Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund,, Freedom to Read Foundation,, Publishers Marketing Association,, Von J. Christiansen,, Amy F. Hugie,, N. George Daines,, Karen Allen,, David A. Blackwell,, Wallace A. Lee,, Happy J. Morgan,, Scott F. Garrett,, Jared W. Eldridge,, Eric S. Lind,, Kelly M. Wright,, Marvin D. Bagley,, George W. Preston,, Ross C. Blackham,, Douglas J. Ahlstrom,, Thomas L. Low,, Brock R. Belnap . Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 11/28/05. (kvs, )
November 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: initial disclosures by W. Andrew McCullough, Computer Solutions International, Mountain Wireless Utah, Sexual Health Network, The, Utah Progressive Network Education Fund, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union, Kings English, The, Association of American Publishers, Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund, Freedom to Read Foundation, Publishers Marketing Association, Sam Wellers Zion Bookstore, Nathan Florence (kvs, )
November 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATED MOTION entry of stipulated order re: agreement between parties filed by Plaintiffs W. Andrew McCullough, Computer Solutions International, Mountain Wireless Utah, Sexual Health Network, The, Utah Progressive Network Education Fund, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union, Kings English, The, Association of American Publishers, Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund, Freedom to Read Foundation, Publishers Marketing Association, Sam Wellers Zion Bookstore, Nathan Florence, Defendants Mark Shurtleff, Von J. Christiansen, Amy F. Hugie, N. George Daines, Gene Strate, Dennis Judd, Melvin C. Wilson, Karen Allen, David A. Blackwell, Wallace A. Lee, Happy J. Morgan, Scott F. Garrett, Jared W. Eldridge, Eric S. Lind, Leray Jackson, Kelly M. Wright, Marvin D. Bagley, George W. Preston, David Yocom, Craig C. Halls, Ross C. Blackham, R. Don Brown, David Brickey, Douglas J. Ahlstrom, Joann Stringham, Carlisle Kay Bryson, Thomas L. Low, Brock R. Belnap, Mark Decaria. (kvs, )
November 10, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by W. Andrew McCullough, Computer Solutions International, Mountain Wireless Utah, Sexual Health Network, The, Utah Progressive Network Education Fund, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union, Kings English, The, Association of American Publishers, Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund, Freedom to Read Foundation, Publishers Marketing Association, Sam Wellers Zion Bookstore, Nathan Florence re 22 Attorney Planning Meeting (kvs, )
November 10, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2006. Joinder of Parties due by 3/1/2006. Discovery due by 8/10/2006. Motions due by 8/31/2006. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2006 02:30 PM in Room 246 before Judge Dee Benson.9 day Bench Trial set for 1/16/2007 08:30 AM in Room 246 before Judge Dee Benson. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/10/05. (kvs, )
November 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (kvs, )
November 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Conference re: scheduling set for Tuesday, 12/6/2005 10:00 AM in Room 436 before Magistrate Judge David Nuffer. Court orders that all parties must be present.(asb, )
October 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (kvs, )
October 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE REMINDER of Attorneys' Planning Meeting Report due five days from receipt of this notice re 13 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: (Notice generated by DON chambers)***The Attorneys Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order forms, available on the court web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/documents/formpage.html, should be prepared 30 days before the Initial Pretrial Conference hearing date. The Court may enter a scheduling order and vacate the hearing if counsel (a) file a stipulated Attorneys Planning Meeting Report and (b) e-mail a Proposed Scheduling Order to ipt@utd.uscourts.gov 30 days before the scheduled hearing.*** Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2005 09:00 AM in Room 477 before Magistrate Judge David Nuffer. (kvs, ) (tsh, )
October 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER for extention of time for plas to resp to dfts motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 10/12/05. (asp)
October 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time for plas to respond to dfts motion to dismiss filed by Plaintiffs W. Andrew McCullough, Computer Solutions International, Mountain Wireless Utah, Sexual Health Network, The, Utah Progressive Network Education Fund, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union, Kings English, The, Association of American Publishers, Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund, Freedom to Read Foundation, Publishers Marketing Association, Sam Wellers Zion Bookstore, Nathan Florence. (asp, )
October 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert A. Peterson, Wesley D. Felix (asp)
September 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION/ORDER granting motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for of Michael A. Bamberger for Mountain Wireless Utah; Sexual Health Network, The; Utah Progressive Network Education Fund; American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression; American Civil Liberties Union; Kings English, The; Association of American Publishers; Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund; Freedom to Read Foundation; Publishers Marketing Association; Sam Wellers Zion Bookstore; W. Andrew McCullough and Computer Solutions International, John B. Morris for Mountain Wireless Utah; Sexual Health Network, The; Utah Progressive Network Education Fund; American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression; American Civil Liberties Union; Kings English, The; Association of American Publishers; Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund; Freedom to Read Foundation; Publishers Marketing Association; Sam Wellers Zion Bookstore; Nathan Florence; W. Andrew McCullough and Computer Solutions International.Attorneys admitted pro hac vice may download a copy of the District of Utah's local rules from court's web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 9/17/05. (kvs, )
August 31, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by Plas attorney) Status Report and Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2005 03:00 PM in Room 246 before Judge Dee Benson. (kvs, )
August 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: (Notice generated by DON chambers)***The Attorneys Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order forms, available on the court web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/documents/formpage.html, should be prepared 30 days before the Initial Pretrial Conference hearing date. The Court may enter a scheduling order and vacate the hearing if counsel (a) file a stipulated Attorneys Planning Meeting Report and (b) e-mail a Proposed Scheduling Order to ipt@utd.uscourts.gov 30 days before the scheduled hearing.*** Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2005 09:00 AM in Room 477 before Magistrate Judge David Nuffer. (kvs, )
August 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to File overlength memo. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 8/23/05. (kvs, )
August 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs W. Andrew McCullough, Computer Solutions International, Mountain Wireless Utah, Sexual Health Network, The, Utah Progressive Network Education Fund, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union, Kings English, The, Association of American Publishers, Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund, Freedom to Read Foundation, Publishers Marketing Association, Sam Wellers Zion Bookstore, Nathan Florence, Defendants Mark Shurtleff, Von J. Christiansen, Amy F. Hugie, N. George Daines, Gene Strate, Dennis Judd, Melvin C. Wilson, Karen Allen, David A. Blackwell, Wallace A. Lee, Happy J. Morgan, Scott F. Garrett, Jared W. Eldridge, Eric S. Lind, Leray Jackson, Kelly M. Wright, Marvin D. Bagley, George W. Preston, David Yocom, Craig C. Halls, Ross C. Blackham, R. Don Brown, David Brickey, Douglas J. Ahlstrom, Joann Stringham, Carlisle Kay Bryson, Thomas L. Low, Brock R. Belnap, Mark Decaria. (kvs, )
August 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Mark Shurtleff, Von J. Christiansen, Amy F. Hugie, N. George Daines, Gene Strate, Dennis Judd, Melvin C. Wilson, Karen Allen, David A. Blackwell, Wallace A. Lee, Happy J. Morgan, Scott F. Garrett, Jared W. Eldridge, Eric S. Lind, Leray Jackson, Kelly M. Wright, Marvin D. Bagley, George W. Preston, David Yocom, Craig C. Halls, Ross C. Blackham, R. Don Brown, David Brickey, Douglas J. Ahlstrom, Joann Stringham, Carlisle Kay Bryson, Thomas L. Low, Brock R. Belnap, Mark Decaria.(kvs, )
August 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Mark L. Shurtleff and David Yocum filed by Mark Shurtleff, Von J. Christiansen, Amy F. Hugie, N. George Daines, Gene Strate, Dennis Judd, Melvin C. Wilson, Karen Allen, David A. Blackwell, Wallace A. Lee, Happy J. Morgan, Scott F. Garrett, Jared W. Eldridge, Eric S. Lind, Leray Jackson, Kelly M. Wright, Marvin D. Bagley, George W. Preston, David Yocom, Craig C. Halls, Ross C. Blackham, R. Don Brown, David Brickey, Douglas J. Ahlstrom, Joann Stringham, Carlisle Kay Bryson, Thomas L. Low, Brock R. Belnap, Mark Decaria. (kvs, )
August 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Mark Shurtleff, Von J. Christiansen, Amy F. Hugie, N. George Daines, Gene Strate, Dennis Judd, Melvin C. Wilson, Karen Allen, David A. Blackwell, Wallace A. Lee, Happy J. Morgan, Scott F. Garrett, Jared W. Eldridge, Eric S. Lind, Leray Jackson, Kelly M. Wright, Marvin D. Bagley, George W. Preston, David Yocom, Craig C. Halls, Ross C. Blackham, R. Don Brown, David Brickey, Douglas J. Ahlstrom, Joann Stringham, Carlisle Kay Bryson, Thomas L. Low, Brock R. Belnap, Mark Decaria. (kvs, )
August 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss 11 of the 14 plaintiffs filed by Defendants Mark Shurtleff, Von J. Christiansen, Amy F. Hugie, N. George Daines, Gene Strate, Dennis Judd, Melvin C. Wilson, Karen Allen, David A. Blackwell, Wallace A. Lee, Happy J. Morgan, Scott F. Garrett, Jared W. Eldridge, Eric S. Lind, Leray Jackson, Kelly M. Wright, Marvin D. Bagley, George W. Preston, David Yocom, Craig C. Halls, Ross C. Blackham, R. Don Brown, David Brickey, Douglas J. Ahlstrom, Joann Stringham, Carlisle Kay Bryson, Thomas L. Low, Brock R. Belnap, Mark Decaria. (kvs, )
August 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File overlength memorandum in support of dfts motion to dismiss filed by Defendants Mark Shurtleff, Von J. Christiansen, Amy F. Hugie, N. George Daines, Gene Strate, Dennis Judd, Melvin C. Wilson, Karen Allen, David A. Blackwell, Wallace A. Lee, Happy J. Morgan, Scott F. Garrett, Jared W. Eldridge, Eric S. Lind, Leray Jackson, Kelly M. Wright, Marvin D. Bagley, George W. Preston, David Yocom, Craig C. Halls, Ross C. Blackham, R. Don Brown, David Brickey, Douglas J. Ahlstrom, Joann Stringham, Carlisle Kay Bryson, Thomas L. Low, Brock R. Belnap, Mark Decaria. (kvs, )
July 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed(copy of signature) filed by W. Andrew McCullough, Computer Solutions International, Mountain Wireless Utah, Sexual Health Network, The, Utah Progressive Network Education Fund, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union, Kings English, The, Association of American Publishers, Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund, Freedom to Read Foundation, Publishers Marketing Association, Sam Wellers Zion Bookstore, Nathan Florence as to Brock R. Belnap Waiver sent on 7/18/2005, answer due 9/16/2005. (jmr, )
June 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL Judge David Sam recused. Case reassigned to Judge Dee Benson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge David Sam on 6/14/05. (blk, )
June 10, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL Judge Ted Stewart recused. Case reassigned to Judge David Sam for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 6/9/05. (ce, )
June 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearence phv mailed to attorney John B. Morris, Michael A. Bamberger, for Plaintiffs W. Andrew McCullough, Computer Solutions International, Mountain Wireless Utah, Sexual Health Network, The, Utah Progressive Network Education Fund, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union, Kings English, The, Association of American Publishers, Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund, Freedom to Read Foundation, Publishers Marketing Association, Sam Wellers Zion Bookstore, Nathan Florence (Attachments: # 1)(jwt, )
June 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark Shurtleff, Von J. Christiansen, Amy F. Hugie, N. George Daines, Gene Strate, Dennis Judd, Melvin C. Wilson, Karen Allen, David A. Blackwell, Wallace A. Lee, Happy J. Morgan, Scott F. Garrett, Jared W. Eldridge, Eric S. Lind, Leray Jackson, Kelly M. Wright, Marvin D. Bagley, George W. Preston, David Yocom, Craig C. Halls, Ross C. Blackham, R. Don Brown, David Brickey, Douglas J. Ahlstrom, Joann Stringham, Carlisle Kay Bryson, Thomas L. Low, Brock R. Belnap, Mark Decaria (Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 4681004171), filed by W. Andrew McCullough, Computer Solutions International, Mountain Wireless Utah, Sexual Health Network, The, Utah Progressive Network Education Fund, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union, Kings English, The, Association of American Publishers, Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund, Freedom to Read Foundation, Publishers Marketing Association, Sam Wellers Zion Bookstore, Nathan Florence.Assigned to Judge Ted Stewart (jwt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kings English, The et al v. Shurtleff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kings English, The
Represented By: Zachary J. Weyher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Wellers Zion Bookstore
Represented By: Zachary J. Weyher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Florence
Represented By: Zachary J. Weyher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. Andrew McCullough
Represented By: Zachary J. Weyher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sexual Health Network, The
Represented By: Zachary J. Weyher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utah Progressive Network Education Fund
Represented By: Zachary J. Weyher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression
Represented By: Zachary J. Weyher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union
Represented By: Zachary J. Weyher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of American Publishers
Represented By: Zachary J. Weyher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comic Book Legal Defunse Fund
Represented By: Zachary J. Weyher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom to Read Foundation
Represented By: Zachary J. Weyher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Publishers Marketing Association
Represented By: Zachary J. Weyher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IPNS of Utah
Represented By: Zachary J. Weyher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rigidtech.com
Represented By: Zachary J. Weyher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Shurtleff
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Von J. Christiansen
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. George Daines
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Strate
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Allen
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Blackwell
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Happy J. Morgan
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott F. Garrett
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared W. Eldridge
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin D. Bagley
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George W. Preston
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig C. Halls
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross C. Blackham
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Brickey
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joann Stringham
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas L. Low
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brock R. Belnap
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Decaria
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Hadfield
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Sidwell
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Rawlings
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Foote
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry L. Huntington
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Hummel
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Waddingham
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jann L. Farris
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lohra L. Miller
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Eyre
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Hogan
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Buhman
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?