Hansen et al v. Native American Oil Refinery et al
Case Number: 2:2006cv00109
Filed: February 6, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
Presiding Judge: Paul G. Cassell
Presiding Judge: Paul M. Warner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 2/21/12. (jlw)
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 209 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 195 Motion for Summary Judgment. Because the record may be more fully developed in the future, plaintiffs' claims against Newcomb are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 5/10/2010. (rlr)
September 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 145 Motion to Compel; granting 147 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 9/3/2008. (rlr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hansen et al v. Native American Oil Refinery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?