Nazaruk v. eBay et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Tetyana Nazaruk
Defendant: eBay, Ace Coins and Robert Baganz
Case Number: 2:2006cv00242
Filed: March 22, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2007 Filing 39 MANDATE of USCA as to 29 Notice of Appeal filed by Tetyana Nazaruk. According to the USCA the Judgment of the USDC for the Dist of UT is Affirmed. Judgment included with mandate: Yes. (jmr)
October 16, 2006 Filing 38 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re 29 Notice of Appeal filed by Tetyana Nazaruk,. USCA Case Number 06-4228. Record received by USCA on 10/12/06 (asp, )
October 16, 2006 Filing 37 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Steven Kuhnhausen (djs, )
October 11, 2006 Filing 36 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to USCA for the Tenth Circuit re 29 Notice of Appeal (asp, )
October 5, 2006 Filing 35 USCA Case Number 06-4228 from USCA 10th Circuit for 29 Notice of Appeal filed by Tetyana Nazaruk,. (asp, )
October 2, 2006 Filing 34 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Steven Kuhnhausen (djs, )
September 27, 2006 Filing 33 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Steven Kuhnhausen (djs, )
September 25, 2006 Filing 32 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Steven Kuhnhausen (djs, )
September 25, 2006 Filing 30 Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA re 29 Notice of Appeal as to Tetyana Nazaruk; packets to counsel. (asp, )
September 22, 2006 Filing 31 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Tetyana Nazaruk. (asp, )
September 22, 2006 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 28 Clerk's Judgment, 27 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations filed by Tetyana Nazaruk. Appeals to the USCA for the Tenth Circuit. Fee Status: NOT PAID. (asp, )
September 21, 2006 Filing 28 CLERKS JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff signed by Louise S. York. Case dismissed as to Ace Coins with prejudice. Case dismissed as to eBay and Baganz without prejudice. (blk, )
September 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 22 Report and Recommendations,, granting 19 Motion to Dismiss filed by Ace Coins,, granting 4 Motion to Dismiss filed by eBay. Case Closed.. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 9/14/06. (blk, )
September 11, 2006 Filing 26 Memorandum re 25 Objection to Report and Recommendations (Memorandum in Opposition) filed by Defendant eBay. (Sabin, Cameron)
August 31, 2006 Filing 25 OBJECTION to 22 Report and Recommendations filed by Plaintiff Tetyana Nazaruk. (blk, )
August 31, 2006 Filing 24 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Steven Kuhnhausen (djs, )
August 25, 2006 Filing 23 REQUEST for Ruling re 21 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Motion Hearing, filed by Plaintiff Tetyana Nazaruk. (kla, )
August 24, 2006 Filing 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ace Coins,, 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, in the alternative, For Failure to State a Claim filed by eBay,. Judge Samuel Alba no longer assigned to case. Objections to R&R due by 9/8/2006. Signed by Judge Samuel Alba on 8/24/06. (blk, )
August 15, 2006 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Samuel Alba. After hearing from plaintiff and counsel for the defendant, Court took the 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, in the alternative, For Failure to State a Claim filed by eBay under advisement. Court will prepare a report and recommendation and submit it to Judge Kimball. Parties will have 10 days to file objections to the report. Written Order to follow oral order: no.Attorney for Plaintiff: Tetyana Nazaruk, pro se, Attorney for Defendant Cameron L. Sabin.(Court Reporter Karen Murakami, Tape #70, Log #1285-2592, Room 248.) (ss, )
July 28, 2006 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re 19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Ace Coins. (blk, )
July 28, 2006 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Ace Coins. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Robertson, Donovan)
July 28, 2006 Third Amended Notice of rescheduling of hearing: Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue hearing rescheduled to 8/15/2006 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 248. (cas)
July 27, 2006 Reset Hearing: Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue rescheduled for 8/17/2006 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 248 before Magistrate Judge Samuel Alba. (cas)
July 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DOCKET TEXT ORDER GRANTING 10 Motion for Hearing . Oral Argument on Defendant eBay's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, for Failure to State a Claim has been scheduled for August 19, 2006, at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Samuel Alba, Courtroom 248. Signed by Judge Samuel Alba on 7/26/06.No attached document. (cas)
July 26, 2006 Reset Hearing: Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, for Failure to State a Claim set for 8/29/2006 9:00 a.m. in Courtoom 248 before Magistrate Judge Samuel Alba. (cas)
July 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Samuel Alba under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters.. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 07/20/06. (abr, )
July 6, 2006 Filing 16 MOTION for Hearing filed by Plaintiff Tetyana Nazaruk. (blk, )
July 5, 2006 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Donovan S. Robertson on behalf of Ace Coins (blk, )
June 29, 2006 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, in the alternative, For Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant eBay. (Sabin, Cameron)
June 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION/ORDER granting motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for of Donovan S. Robertson for Ace Coins.Attorneys admitted pro hac vice may download a copy of the District of Utah's local rules from court's web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 6/26/06. (blk, )
June 15, 2006 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re 10 MOTION for Hearing and 3 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Tetyana Nazaruk. (blk, )
June 12, 2006 Filing 11 Modification of Docket: Error: Document image was corrupt. Correction: Attached a good image to the docket event. re 10 MOTION for Hearing. (blk, )
June 9, 2006 Filing 10 MOTION for Hearing filed by Plaintiff Tetyana Nazaruk. (blk, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2006 (blk, ).
June 9, 2006 Filing 9 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Summons and Certified Mail Reciepts of Summons & Complaint sent to: Ebay and ACE Coins. (blk, )
June 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION/ORDER granting motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for of Michael G. Rhodes for eBay, Benjamin Chapman for eBay.Attorneys admitted pro hac vice may download a copy of the District of Utah's local rules from court's web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 6/8/06. (blk, )
June 6, 2006 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron L. Sabin on behalf of eBay (Sabin, Cameron)
June 6, 2006 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Allyson Willoughby re 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, in the alternative, For Failure to State a Claim filed by eBay. (Sabin, Cameron)
June 6, 2006 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, in the alternative, For Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant eBay. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Part 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Part 2# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 3# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Sabin, Cameron)
June 6, 2006 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, in the alternative, For Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant eBay. (Sabin, Cameron)
March 22, 2006 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against eBay, Ace Coins, Robert Baganz (Fee Status: IFP), filed by Tetyana Nazaruk. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit to Complaint)Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (rlr, )
March 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. . Signed by Judge Samuel Alba on 03/22/06. (rlr, )
March 22, 2006 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Received by the court on: 03/20/06) filed by Plaintiff Tetyana Nazaruk. (rlr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nazaruk v. eBay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tetyana Nazaruk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBay
Represented By: Cameron L. Sabin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Coins
Represented By: Donovan S. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Baganz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?