Ruston v. Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Lester Jon Ruston
Defendant: Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Gordon B. Hinckley, Victor James Ruston, Margaret Elizabeth Ruston, Jerry Henderson, Allison Ruston-Smith, Mel Chadwick, Kent Robertson, Ian James Ruston, Brad Oates and Larry K. Hercules
Case Number: 2:2006cv00526
Filed: June 30, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DISMISSING CASE - Court dismisses the case WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Case Closed Judge David Nuffer no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 10/08/07. (rlr)
August 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION to Disqualify Judge filed by Plaintiff Lester Jon Ruston. Motions referred to David Nuffer.(ce)
August 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendant(s) all dft's filed by Lester Jon Ruston.Objections to R&R due by 9/7/2007. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 08/22/2007. (asp)
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 14 Motion for Leave to File ; denying 18 Motion for Service of Process ; denying 19 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 26 Motion to Amend/Correct ; denying 28 Motion to Amend/Correct ; denying 30 Motion for joinder of additional parties supplementation to request for a TRO ; denying 32 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 08/20/2007. (asp)
August 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Emergency motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Lester Jon Ruston. Motions referred to David Nuffer.(kpf)
August 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 22 Motion to Strike 21 Response (NOT to motion). Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 08/13/2007. (asp)
August 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying leave to proceed without prepayment of fees. Plaintiff is to pay the entire $350 filing fee within 30 days from the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in the dismissal of the complaint. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 08/13/2007. (asp)
August 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus by Lester Jon Ruston. (kpf)
August 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 30 MOTION for joinder of additional parties supplementation to request for a TRO filed by Defendants Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Gordon B. Hinckley. (Richards, Matthew)
July 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for joinder of additional parties supplementation to request for a TRO filed by Plaintiff Lester Jon Ruston. Motions referred to David Nuffer.(kpf)
June 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re 26 MOTION to Amend/Correct 3 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Lester Jon Ruston. (ce)
June 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Amend/Correct 3 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Lester Jon Ruston. Motions referred to David Nuffer.(ce)
June 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 26 MOTION to Amend/Correct 3 Complaint, filed by Defendants Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Gordon B. Hinckley. (Richards, Matthew)
May 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint 3 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Lester Jon Ruston. Motions referred to David Nuffer.(kpf)
May 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lester Jon Ruston (kpf)
March 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion/Plaintiffs omnibus traverse to dft's motion to strike/motion for sanctions re 22 MOTION to Strike 21 Response (NOT to motion) filed by Plaintiff Lester Jon Ruston. (kpf)
February 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 4 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 02/21/2007. (asp)
February 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Strike 21 Response (NOT to motion) filed by Defendants Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Gordon B. Hinckley. Motions referred to David Nuffer.(Starr, Justin)
January 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER 34 ORDER ; RESPONSE re 16 Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion, 17 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Plaintiff Lester Jon Ruston. (asp) Modified on 8/13/2007 added stricken information to docket text (asp).
January 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 19 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Defendants Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Gordon B. Hinckley. (Starr, Justin)
January 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Lester Jon Ruston. Motions referred to David Nuffer.(asp)
January 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Service of Process filed by Plaintiff Lester Jon Ruston. Motions referred to David Nuffer.(asp)
December 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Gordon B. Hinckley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(rlr, )
December 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re 14 MOTION for Leave to File amended complaint and in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Gordon B. Hinckley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Starr, Justin)
December 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Pla's summoned to be served. (kpf, )
December 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File amended complaint filed by Plaintiff Lester Jon Ruston. (kpf, )
December 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE to dfts motion to dismiss re 11 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Lester Jon Ruston. (kpf, )
November 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Gordon B. Hinckley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J)(Richards, Matthew)
November 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Gordon B. Hinckley. (Richards, Matthew)
November 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew K. Richards on behalf of Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Gordon B. Hinckley (Richards, Matthew)
September 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Lester Jon Rushton re 8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendant(s) all dft's filed by Lester Jon Ruston. (kpf, )
September 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendant(s) all dft's filed by Plaintiff Lester Jon Ruston. (kpf, )
August 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Lester Jon Ruston in support of RICO Allegations and Plaintiffs memorandum of Points and authorities in support of RICA Allegations filed by Lester Jon Ruston. (kpf, )
July 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David Nuffer under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 7/19/06. (asp, )
July 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDMENT AND SUPPLENTATION TO COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Ian James Ruston.(kpf, )
July 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Compel relief 18 USC 3771 and 3521 filed by Plaintiff Lester Jon Ruston. (kpf, )
June 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Kent Robertson, Ian James Ruston, Brad Oates, Larry K. Hercules, Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Gordon B. Hinckley, Victor James Ruston, Margaret Elizabeth Ruston, Jerry Henderson, Allison Ruston-Smith, Mel Chadwick (Fee Status: IFP), filed by Lester Jon Ruston.Assigned to Judge Dee Benson (rlr, )
June 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. . Signed by Judge Samuel Alba on 06/29/06. (rlr, )
June 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Received by the court on: 06/15/06) filed by Plaintiff Lester Jon Ruston. (rlr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruston v. Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester Jon Ruston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints
Represented By: Justin W. Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon B. Hinckley
Represented By: Justin W. Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor James Ruston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Elizabeth Ruston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Ruston-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mel Chadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian James Ruston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Oates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry K. Hercules
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?