Brigham Young University et al v. Pfizer et al
Case Number: 2:2006cv00890
Filed: October 18, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 945 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 762 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 04/16/2012. (lnp)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 919 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDERgranting in part and denying in part 722 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 749 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 03/29/2012. (tls)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 918 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER denying 724 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 03/27/2012. (tls)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 915 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 753 BYU's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re Mitigation of Damages and Failure to Patent as Described in Special Defenses Numbered 24 and 25 in the Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 03/26/2012. (tls)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 912 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDERgranting in part and denying in part 755 Pfizer's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment No. 13. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 03/22/2012. (tls)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 910 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 901 Motion to Strike portions of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief re: Inventorship (Docket No. 90 ). Those portions that do not conform to the Court's request for supplemental briefing will be disregarded. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 3/20/2012. (rlr)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 900 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 682 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 701 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 03/16/2012. (tls)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 899 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 758 BYU's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Defendants' Breach of Paragraph 4.1 of the Research Agreement. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 03/15/2012. (tls)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 896 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDERdenying 726 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 747 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 03/12/2012. (tls)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 893 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 855 Motion For Permission to Provide Certain Documents Labeled as Confidential Under the Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 03/09/2012. (asp)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 862 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying in part 857 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 02/02/2012. (asp)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 828 ORDER and MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 791 Defendants' Expedited Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Amended Memorandum in Support of Renewed Motion for Further Discovery Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 01/11/2012. (tls)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 663 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 522 Motion to Compel. Court orders BYU to produce those documents to Pfizer as set forth above within thirty days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 7/12/2011. (ce)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 650 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 649 Motion to Reopen Biological Sampling ; finding as moot 634 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 06/30/2011. (asp)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 645 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 545 Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Documents Submitted for In Camera Review. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 6/23/2011. (ce)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 492 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Overruling Winston & Strawn LLP's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Memorandum Decision and Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Disqualify; finding as moot 474 Motion to Stay. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 9/29/2010. (las)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 468 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 453 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 8/26/2010. (las)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 437 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 342 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 344 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 06/23/2010. (asp)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 434 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 386 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 06/11/2010. (asp)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 409 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 351 Motion for Sanctions ; finding as moot 401 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 05/04/2010. (asp)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 303 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 179 Motion for Sanctions; Based upon the forgoing BYU's Motion for Sanctions is Granted in part and denied in part. Pfizer is ordered to pay $852,315.80 in costs and fees by November 30, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 10/28/2009. (kpf)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 302 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 172 Motion to Amend/Correct for Leave From and Modification to the Protective Order; denying 194 Motion for Suspension of Reissue Proceedings; denying 214 Motion for Partial Summary Judgm ent Regarding Integration of the Research Agreement, Dated August 1, 1991; finding/denying as moot 255 Motion re 252 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (Alternative) Rule 56(f) Motion. For details, see Memorandum Decision. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 9/30/2009. (ce)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brigham Young University et al v. Pfizer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?