Lehi Roller Mills v. Asian Trade Exponents et al
Case Number: 2:2006cv01001
Filed: December 1, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDERgranting 238 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 06/22/2012. (tls)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 76 Lehi Roller Mills Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re: Defendant's Liability for Unjust Enrichment; granting in part and denying in part 80 Lehi Roller Mills' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Defendant's Affirmative Defenses; denying 85 Cal-Agrex's Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 109 Cal-Agrex's Motion to Strike Portions of Lehi Roller Mills' Declarations in Support of Motions for Partial Summary Judgment and Request for Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 3/31/2011. (ce)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER denying 52 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is Denied without prejudice to be renewed, if appropriate, at the close of discovery. granting 60 Motion for Relief Pursuant to Rule 56(f). Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 8/12/09. (las)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER granting 32 Motion to Dismiss ; granting 33 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 2/19/09. (jwt)
October 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 10/9/08. (jwt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lehi Roller Mills v. Asian Trade Exponents et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?