Nemelka v. Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Christopher M. Nemelka
Defendant: Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints., Jeffrey R. Holland, Russell M. Ballard, Denis P. Smith and Hyrum W. Smith
Case Number: 2:2007cv00524
Filed: July 17, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Paul G. Cassell
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Case Closed. Signed by Judge Paul G. Cassell on 07/18/2007. (asp)
July 17, 2007 Filing 5 MOTION for Service of Process filed by Plaintiff Christopher M. Nemelka. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(jwt)
July 17, 2007 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Christopher M. Nemelka. (jwt)
July 17, 2007 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Christopher M. Nemelka (Originally received by the court on 7/13/07). (Fee Status: IFP). Assigned to Judge Paul G. Cassell (jwt)
July 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Samuel Alba on 7/17/07. (jwt)
July 16, 2007 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Received by the court on: 7/13/07) filed by Plaintiff Christopher M. Nemelka. (jwt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nemelka v. Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher M. Nemelka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey R. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell M. Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denis P. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyrum W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?