Stewart v. Stoller et al

Plaintiff: Sophia Stewart
Defendant: Michael T. Stoller, Jonathan Lubell and Gary Brown
Case Number: 2:2007cv00552
Filed: July 30, 2007
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2014 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Case Closed.; adopting Report and Recommendations re 283 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 9/25/14. (jlw)
March 25, 2014 270 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER denying 260 Motion for Judicial Notice to Prove Damages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 3/25/14. (jlw)
February 14, 2014 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to 263 Report and Recommendations. Defendant Michael Stoller is DISMISSED from this case. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 02/14/2014. (tls)
June 19, 2013 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; granting 213 Motion in Limine; adopting Report and Recommendations re 250 Report and Recommendations. The case is dismissed against Gary Brown. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 6/17/13. (jlw)
April 25, 2013 245 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 242 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 4/25/13. (jlw)
April 5, 2013 239 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 228 Motion to Vacate ; denying 228 Motion to Stay ; denying 228 Motion to Continue; denying 229 Motion to Compel; denying 230 Motion ; denying 231 Motion ; denying 232 Motion ; denying 233 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 4/5/13. (jlw)
January 18, 2013 237 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 210 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 1/18/13. (jlw)
December 6, 2012 225 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order Denying Motion for Recusal(Docket No. 209)-denying 209 Motion for Recusal filed by Plaintiff Sophia Stewart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/6/12. (jmr)
December 4, 2012 218 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order Denying Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay- denying 195 Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/3/12. (jmr)
April 20, 2012 189 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order-adopting Report and Recommendations re 183 Report and Recommendations.; re 143 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 111 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dean Webb, 130 MOTION to Strike 127 A ffidavit in Support of Motion of Mike Otto MOTION to Strike 127 Affidavit in Support of Motion of Mike Otto. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 4/20/12. (jmr) Modified on 4/20/2012-report and recommendation 143 has already been ruled on. (jmr).
June 30, 2011 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS-Accordingly, the court APPROVES andADOPTS the R & R. Mr. Webbs motion Mr. Webbs motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No 111) is thus GRANTED and his related motion to strike (Dkt. No. 130) is deemed MOOT. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 6/30/11. (jmr)
December 9, 2010 124 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION striking 113 Motion to Deny Defendant Dean Webb's Summary Judgment; striking 119 Motion to Deny Defendant Dean Webb's Motion to Strike Affidavit of Plaintiff Sophie Stewart; finding as moot 115 Motion to Strike Affidavit of Sophia Stewart ; granting 123 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant Dean Webb's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 12/9/2010. (jtj)
August 11, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 76 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 8/11/09. (jwt)
July 14, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 59 Motion for Judicial Notice; denying 61 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 64 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 7/14/09. (jwt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Stoller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Stewart
Represented By: Edward W. McBride, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T. Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Lubell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?