Salzman et al v. Henderson et al
Plaintiff: David Salzman and Sonia Salazar
Defendant: Terry Henderson and Shaunna Hood
Case Number: 2:2007cv00854
Filed: November 2, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 281 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 219 Motion to Vacate ; granting 236 Motion for Extension of Time for Briefing on Outstanding Pre-Trial Motions; granting 249 Motion to Determine Subject Matter Jurisdiction ; granting in part and denying in part 264 Motion to Strike ; denying 268 Motion to sever. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 5/6/2010. (las)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 175 Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Discovery Answers; granting 177 Motion for Sanctions; granting 207 Motion in Limine to Exclude Video; deferring ruling on and setting briefing for 219 Motion to Vacate; Jury Trial reset for 7/12/2010 08:30 AM in Room 102 before Judge Clark Waddoups. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 1/27/10 (alt)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and deferring in part 111 Motion in Limine Re: Plaintiff's Loan Documents; denying 113 Motion in Limine Re: Settlement Offers; granting in part and denying in part 161 Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions from Merlin Taylor. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 1/15/2010. (las)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 117 Motion to Strike ; denying 134 Motion to Strike. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 1/13/2010. (las)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION denying as moot 82 Motion for Reconsideration; granting 86 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 91 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot 120 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 1/8/10 (alt)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: The Court regrets its inability to rule definitively upon Plaintiffs' pending motion to compel. In order to do so, however, the Court needs Defendants to clarify: the intended testimony of Mr. Rametta, the characte r of the documents which they seek to protect and a clarification as to how the protected documents are germane to the subject matter of Mr. Rametta's review as a consulting expert. Signed by Judge Brooke C. Wells on 12/22/09. (las) Modified on 12/23/2009 corrected the Judge that issued the decision (las).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salzman et al v. Henderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Salzman
Represented By: Robert J. Shelby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Salazar
Represented By: Robert J. Shelby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaunna Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?