United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company v. United States Sports Specialty Association
Plaintiff: United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company
Defendant: United States Sports Specialty Association
Case Number: 2:2007cv00996
Filed: December 21, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: Brooke C. Wells
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 319 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 303 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 02/05/2013. (asp)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 318 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 302 Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of DefendantsExpert Robert Wallace and for a Daubert Hearing. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 2/4/13. (ss)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 294 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 273 Motion in Limine to Exclude Mediation Communications. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 1/22/13 (alt)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 287 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 274 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 01/18/2013. (tls)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 262 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 258 Motion to Substitute Party. National Indemnity and Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London who subscribed to policy numbers D064L0074 and D064Y00423 added. United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company terminated. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 12/19/2012. (asp)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 185 Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 06/25/2012. (tls)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company v. United States Sports Specialty Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company
Represented By: Barton H. Kunz, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Sports Specialty Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?