Kane County (1) v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Kane County
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2008cv00315
Filed: April 25, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Kane
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2409(a) Quiet Title Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 345 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER: Granting 343 Motion to Expedite Consideration; Denying 332 Motion to Consolidate Cases; Denied/finding as moot 344 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 05/03/2021. (kpf)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER-denying 298 Motion to Intervene. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 8/21/18. (jmr)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order-The court requests that Plaintiffs submit a proposed order that reflects the courts ruling in this case. The order shall be submitted on or before April 3, 2013. If the United States has any objections to Plaintiffs proposed order, it shall file its objection on or before April 17, 2013. Plaintiffs shall file any reply on or before May 1, 2013. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 3/20/13. (jmr)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 119 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ; denying as moot 142 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 06/20/2011. (asp)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDERdenying 86 Motion to Stay proceedings pending appeal. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 11/13/09. (las)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 28 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 4/6/09 (alt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kane County (1) v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kane County
Represented By: Shawn T. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?