American Charities for Reasonable Fundraising Regulation et al v. Olsen

Plaintiff: American Charities for Reasonable Fundraising Regulation and Rainbow Direct Marketing
Defendant: Kevin V. Olsen
Case Number: 2:2008cv00875
Filed: November 12, 2008
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Constitutional - State Statute Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2015 314 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 300 Motion to Compel; denying 313 Motion for Leave to File. Defendants Motion To Compel is denied without prejudice (doc. 300). Any re-filed motion should be submitted to the court no later than tw enty (20) days from the date of this Order. Plaintiffs opposition to the motion shall be due ten (10) days thereafter, and Defendants reply shall be due an additional ten (10) days after Plaintiffs opposition is filed. While the court recognizes t hat this schedule contemplates shorter briefing times than typically allowed under the rules, any re-filed motion is intended to provide clarity and specificity and does not contemplate the development of new legal arguments or theories. See DUCivR 7-1(b)(3)(A)(The court may order shorter briefing periods....). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/5/2015. (las)
November 13, 2013 224 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order denying 177 Motion for Scheduling Order and Motion for Protective Order; denying without prejudice 188 Motion for Protective Order and Motion to Quash; granting 193 Cross Motion to Deny Plaintif f's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Without a Hearing; denying 222 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to New Issues Raised for the First Time in Plaintiffs' Reply Supporting Emergency Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/13/2013. (tls)
February 15, 2011 101 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 89 Motion to Compel; denying 91 Motion to Strike ; denying 97 Motion for Hearing. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 2/15/2011. (jtj)
July 15, 2010 83 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDERdenying 65 Motion to Dismiss ; finding as moot 66 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 07/15/2010. (kpf)
December 18, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order; denying 37 Motion to Dismiss; Defendants Motion to Dismiss is DENIED; finding as moot 43 Motion to Strike; Defendants Motion to Strike is MOOT. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 12/18/2009. (kpf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Charities for Reasonable Fundraising Regulation et al v. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Charities for Reasonable Fundraising Regulation
Represented By: Graden P. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rainbow Direct Marketing
Represented By: Graden P. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin V. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?