American Charities for Reasonable Fundraising Regulation et al v. Olsen
Plaintiff: |
American Charities for Reasonable Fundraising Regulation and Rainbow Direct Marketing |
Defendant: |
Kevin V. Olsen |
Case Number: |
2:2008cv00875 |
Filed: |
November 12, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Utah |
Office: |
Constitutional - State Statute Office |
County: |
Salt Lake |
Presiding Judge: |
Dale A. Kimball |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 10, 2017 |
Filing
434
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 417 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 418 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/10/17 (alt)
|
September 13, 2016 |
Filing
399
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - granting in part and denying in part 365 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting in part and denying in part 373 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 9/13/2016. (jds)
|
August 5, 2015 |
Filing
314
MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 300 Motion to Compel; denying 313 Motion for Leave to File. Defendants Motion To Compel is denied without prejudice (doc. 300). Any re-filed motion should be submitted to the court no later than tw enty (20) days from the date of this Order. Plaintiffs opposition to the motion shall be due ten (10) days thereafter, and Defendants reply shall be due an additional ten (10) days after Plaintiffs opposition is filed. While the court recognizes t hat this schedule contemplates shorter briefing times than typically allowed under the rules, any re-filed motion is intended to provide clarity and specificity and does not contemplate the development of new legal arguments or theories. See DUCivR 7-1(b)(3)(A)(The court may order shorter briefing periods....). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/5/2015. (las)
|
November 13, 2013 |
Filing
224
MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order denying 177 Motion for Scheduling Order and Motion for Protective Order; denying without prejudice 188 Motion for Protective Order and Motion to Quash; granting 193 Cross Motion to Deny Plaintif f's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Without a Hearing; denying 222 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to New Issues Raised for the First Time in Plaintiffs' Reply Supporting Emergency Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/13/2013. (tls)
|
February 15, 2011 |
Filing
101
MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 89 Motion to Compel; denying 91 Motion to Strike ; denying 97 Motion for Hearing. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 2/15/2011. (jtj)
|
July 15, 2010 |
Filing
83
MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDERdenying 65 Motion to Dismiss ; finding as moot 66 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 07/15/2010. (kpf)
|
December 18, 2009 |
Filing
59
MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order; denying 37 Motion to Dismiss; Defendants Motion to Dismiss is DENIED; finding as moot 43 Motion to Strike; Defendants Motion to Strike is MOOT. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 12/18/2009. (kpf)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?