Mud Buddy v. Gator Tail

Plaintiff: Mud Buddy
Defendant: Gator Tail
Case Number: 2:2008cv00972
Filed: December 18, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Patent Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:0271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part 153 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; dismissing Mud Buddy's claims of direct infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,302,750, claims 1-6, 9-12, 14-20, and U.S. Patent No. 6,361,388, claims 14-16 and 19. The parties shall submit additional briefing on whether summary judgment in favor of Gator Tail under the doctrine of equivalents is proper given the lack of admissible evidence on the issue of pressurization. This issue was argued in marginal notes in the draft order but deserves a more full exposition. The parties shall file simultaneous briefs on this issue on or before 12:00 pm on Thursday October 3, 2013. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 09/26/2013. (asp)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND WRITTEN ORDER FOLLOWING 120 Minute Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (oral order of 12/14/12). Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 5/1/13 (alt) Modified on 5/1/2013: added link to 95 Motion (alt)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MEMORANDUM DECISION/Markman Order. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 7/4/12 (alt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mud Buddy v. Gator Tail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mud Buddy
Represented By: Steve M. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gator Tail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?