Brazzle v. Washington City

Plaintiff: Andre Brazzle
Defendant: Washington City
Case Number: 2:2009cv00074
Filed: January 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: David Sam
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 64 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 09/30/2013. (asp)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 82 Motion to Strike [76-8] Declaration of Jeff McKinney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 09/14/2012. (asp)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 20 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 22 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 02/17/2010. (asp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brazzle v. Washington City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Brazzle
Represented By: Erik Strindberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?