Mitan v. BRCSLC
Plaintiff: Keith J. Mitan
Defendant: BRCSLC
Case Number: 2:2009cv00363
Filed: April 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 63 Motion for Relief from Judgment. It is further Ordered that Defendant's request for attorney fees is Denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 12/20/2010. (las)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 44 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 10/13/2010. (las)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 48 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 07/01/2010. (asp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitan v. BRCSLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith J. Mitan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRCSLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?