Sara Lee Corporation v. Sycamore Family Bakery et al
Plaintiff: Sara Lee Corporation
Defendant: Sycamore Family Bakery and Leland Sycamore
Case Number: 2:2009cv00523
Filed: June 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Trademark
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 501 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Sycamore Family LLC's 487 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal; and granting Receiver's 495 Motion for Court to Appoint Appraisers for Eleven Properties Owned by Sycamore Family LLC. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 3/30/2020. (eat)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 479 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER adopting the Receiver's recommendations and ordering the Receiver: (1) to promptly pay EarthGrains $1.1 million in cash; and (2) liquidate sufficient LLC real estate assets to allow for the payment of the remaining distributions, $2,759,898.96, to EarthGrains. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 11/14/2019. (eat)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 462 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting EarthGrains' 448 Motion for Attorney Fees. The court awards EarthGrains attorneys' fees in connection with its Renewed Motion for Contempt Sanctions and the Sycamore Family's Motion to Appoint Special Master in the amount of $176,811.94 and costs in the amount of $3,072.67. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 2/8/2019. (eat)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 446 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 419 Renewed Motion for Contempt Sanctions; and denying 435 Motion to Appoint Special Master. The court will separately enter an order appointing Wayne Klein as a receiver of the Sycamore Family LLC, and setting forth his authority and responsibilities. EarthGrains is directed to file its supporting documentation for attorney fees in connection with these pending motions within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 11/2/2018. (eat)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 395 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying without Prejudice 367 Plaintiff's MOTION for Contempt Sanctions to be renewed after discovery, if appropriate ; denying 378 Motion to Stay ; granting 380 Motion for Order Restraining Sale Of Sycamore Family LLC Asset. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 8/21/2015. (jds)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 309 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: EarthGrains Baking Companies, Inc. awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $1,025,473.40 and $65,863.00 in costs. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 12/14/12. (jlw)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 258 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 249 Motion for Trebled Compensatory Damages and Pre-Judgment Interest. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 06/26/2012. (asp)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 181 Motion to Enforce or Clarify Prior Contempt Sanctions Order: The contempt sanctions and attorney fees, totaling $41,102.00, are due and owing immediately. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 8/25/11 (alt)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 143 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 145 Motion in Limine; denying 147 Motion in Limine; denying 149 Motion in Limine; denying 151 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 154 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 8/4/11 (alt)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 107 Motion for Sanctions: The court awards Sara Lee $10,136.00 in compensatory damages, $10,136.00 in coercive sanctions, and reasonable attorneys fees to be determined after further briefing. Sara Lee shall submit briefing and supporting documentation on its requested attorneys fees within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 5/12/11 (alt)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM DECISION and granting 35 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. 1) It is hereby ordered that Sara Lee's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED, and the court hereby issues the following injunction: Defendants, their officers, agen ts, servants, employees, and attorneys, and all persons in active concert or participation with them who receive actual notice of this Preliminary Injunction by personal service or otherwise, are hereby prohibited and enjoined during the pendency of this litigation from. See order for details. 2) Sara Lee shall post a security bond in the amount of Ten Thousand Dollars (10,000.00) before this Order shall take effect. Defendants shall have fifteen (15) business days from the effective date of this Order to fully comply with the terms of this Order. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 10/27/2009. (kpf)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Granting Expedited Discovery and Briefing. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 6-22-09. (sih)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sara Lee Corporation v. Sycamore Family Bakery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Lee Corporation
Represented By: Juliette P. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sycamore Family Bakery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leland Sycamore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?