Lutron Electronics v. Crestron Electronics et al

Plaintiff: Lutron Electronics
Defendant: Crestron Electronics, Face Group, Lava and Audio Vision Systems
Case Number: 2:2009cv00707
Filed: August 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Summit
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35:0271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 758 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying 555 Sealed Motion to Preclude the Testimony and Opinions of Dean P. Neikirk and Steven Leeb. The court grants the motion to strike with respect to the experts opinion about the nexus between the 442 Patent and the commercial success of Lutrons products. The court denies the motion with respect to copying. Lutron, however, must lay sufficient foundation to show a nexus between the alleged copying and the novel aspects of the 442 Patent before Dr. Neikirks opinion on copying is admissible. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 09/12/2013. (asp)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 693 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order-Claims and counterclaims for the '103 '442 and '460 Patents shall proceed to Jury Trial set for 9/9/2013 08:30 AM in Room 102 before Judge Clark Waddoups.), Set Deadlines as to 424 *SEALED DOCUMENT* SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support*SEALED DOCUMENT* SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support, 487 MOTION to Strike 424 *SEALED DOCUMENT* SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support*SEALED DOCUMENT* SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support and Memorandum in Support MOTION to Strike 424 *SEALED DOCUMENT* SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support*SEALED DOCUMENT* SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support and Memoran dum in Support , 408 *SEALED DOCUMENT* SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support*SEALED DOCUMENT* SEALED MOTION and Memorandum in Support.( Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2013 08:30 AM in Room 102 before Judge Clark Waddoups.) Daubert Motions 555 , 556 , 557 , 569 and 470 will be hearing on June 19, 20, and 21, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 5/14/13. (jmr)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 692 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 385 Motion for Summary Judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 5/9/13. (jmr)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 319 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order-granting 206 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. See order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 8/6/12. (jmr)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order Construing Claims Pursuant to Markman Hearing-See order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 7/3/12. (jmr)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 74 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Scott D. Stimpson; Timothy P. Heaton and David Chunyi Lee withdrawn from case; denying 76 Motion to Expedite; denying 76 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Attorney Scott D. Stimpson; Timothy P. Heaton and David Chunyi Lee terminated; finding as moot 79 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 11/12/2010. (rlr)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying 35 Motion to Bifurcate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 5/19/2010. (rlr)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 21 Motion to Change Venue; denying 24 Motion to Sever. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 4/13/2010. (rlr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lutron Electronics v. Crestron Electronics et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lutron Electronics
Represented By: Brent O. Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crestron Electronics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Face Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audio Vision Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?