Dazzlesmile et al v. Epic Advertising et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Dazzlesmile and Optimal Health Science
Defendant: Epic Advertising, Azoogle.com, Azoogleads US, Farend Services, Jesse David Willms, 1021018 Alberta, Atlast Holdings, Google, Yahoo! and Microsoft
Case Number: 2:2009cv01043
Filed: November 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Paul M. Warner
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Report on the Final Decision of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jmr)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION of Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Dazzlesmile, Optimal Health Science. (Hardin, Jason)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 57 Motion to Stay. For good cause shown and pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties, the Court hereby ordered the above-caption action STAYED until August 31, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 6/7/2010. (jtj)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Stipulated MOTION to Stay Action Pending Completion of Settlement Obligations filed by Defendants 1021018 Alberta, Farend Services, Jesse David Willms. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kronenberger, Karl)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Microsoft. (jtj)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark M. Bettilyon on behalf of Microsoft (Bettilyon, Mark)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 52 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 7 Amended Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Azoogle.com answer due 6/4/2010; Azoogleads US answer due 6/4/2010; Farend Services answer due 6/4/2010; Jesse David Willms answer due 6/4/2010; 1021018 Alberta answer due 6/4/2010; Neverblue Media answer due 6/4/2010; Epic Advertising answer due 6/4/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 5/24/2010. (jtj)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Farend Services. (jtj)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Farend Services, Jesse David Willms, 1021018 Alberta. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kronenberger, Karl)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acceptance of Service Acknowledgment filed by Dazzlesmile, Optimal Health Science.Jesse David Willms served on 5/4/2010, answer due 5/25/2010; 1021018 Alberta served on 5/4/2010, answer due 5/25/2010. (Hardin, Jason)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 49 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Donald A. Degnan for Neverblue Media. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 5/11/2010. (jtj)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Donald A. Degnan, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 10880000000001111588, filed by Defendant Neverblue Media. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Marshall, Romaine)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 7 Amended Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Epic Advertising answer due 5/21/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 5/7/2010. (jtj)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Epic Advertising. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order for Extension of Time to Answer)(Saber, R.)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Epic Advertising. (jtj)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Lee Saber on behalf of Epic Advertising (Saber, R.)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Farend Services answer due 5/21/2010; Jesse David Willms answer due 5/21/2010; 1021018 Alberta answer due 5/21/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 5/5/2010. (jtj)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 41 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 5/5/2010. (jtj)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Farend Services, Jesse David Willms, 1021018 Alberta. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kronenberger, Karl)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order ANSWER DEADLINE UPDATED for Neverblue Media answer due 5/24/2010 per Order 43 . (jtj)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time To Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendant Neverblue Media. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marshall, Romaine)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dazzlesmile, Optimal Health Science as to Farend Services served on 4/15/2010, answer due 5/6/2010. (Hardin, Jason)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dazzlesmile, Optimal Health Science as to Neverblue Media served on 4/12/2010, answer due 5/3/2010. (Hardin, Jason)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 36 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Karl S. Kronenberger for Jesse David Willms and 1021018 Alberta. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 4/20/2010. (jtj)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Jesse David Willms, 1021018 Alberta. (jtj)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Karl S. Kronenberger and Consent of Local Counsel, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 10880000000001096549, filed by Defendants Jesse David Willms, 1021018 Alberta. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Anderson, Sammi)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Sammi V. Anderson on behalf of Jesse David Willms, 1021018 Alberta (Anderson, Sammi)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 28 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas R. Watson for Google. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 4/15/2010. (jtj)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Margret Caruso for Google. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 4/15/2010. (jtj)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Virginia Wolk for Yahoo!. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 4/15/2010. (jtj)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 21 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Howard S. Michael for Yahoo!. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 4/15/2010. (jtj)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joshua S. Frick for Yahoo!. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 4/15/2010. (jtj)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David S. Fleming for Yahoo!. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 4/15/2010. (jtj)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas R. Watson, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 10880000000001094646, filed by Defendant Google. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Application, # 2 Exhibit B: Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit C: Electronic Case Filing Registration Form)(Benard, Blaine) Modified on 4/15/2010 changed filer from Dazzlesmile to Google (asp).
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Margret Caruso, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 10880000000001094635, filed by Defendant Google. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B: Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit C: Electronic Case Filing Registration Form)(Benard, Blaine) Modified on 4/15/2010 changed filer from Dazzlesmile to Google (asp).
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Google. (Benard, Blaine)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Google. (jtj)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Google.(Benard, Blaine)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Virginia Wolk, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 10880000000001092833, filed by Defendant Yahoo!, Counter Claimant Yahoo!. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit B - Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Marshall, Ryan)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joshua S. Frick, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 10880000000001092823, filed by Defendant Yahoo!, Counter Claimant Yahoo!. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit B - Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Marshall, Ryan)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Howard S. Michael, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 10880000000001092815, filed by Defendant Yahoo!, Counter Claimant Yahoo!. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit B - Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Marshall, Ryan)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David S. Fleming, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 10880000000001092802, filed by Defendant Yahoo!, Counter Claimant Yahoo!. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit B - Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Marshall, Ryan)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Dazzlesmile, Optimal Health Science, Defendant Yahoo!. (jtj)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Yahoo!, Counter Claimant Yahoo!. (Marshall, Ryan)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Yahoo! Inc.'s ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Dazzlesmile, Optimal Health Science filed by Yahoo!.(Marshall, Ryan)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dazzlesmile, Optimal Health Science as to Azoogleads US served on 3/23/2010, answer due 4/13/2010. (Hardin, Jason)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dazzlesmile, Optimal Health Science as to Azoogle.com served on 3/23/2010, answer due 4/13/2010. (Hardin, Jason)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Neverblue Media.Instructions to Counsel:1. Log into CM/ECF (Not PACER) before clicking on the document number2. Print the issued summons for service. (tls)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dazzlesmile, Optimal Health Science as to Google served on 3/23/2010, answer due 4/13/2010. (Hardin, Jason)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dazzlesmile, Optimal Health Science as to Yahoo! served on 3/23/2010, answer due 4/13/2010. (Hardin, Jason)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dazzlesmile, Optimal Health Science as to Microsoft served on 3/23/2010, answer due 4/13/2010. (Hardin, Jason)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dazzlesmile, Optimal Health Science as to Epic Advertising served on 3/23/2010, answer due 4/13/2010. (Hardin, Jason)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dazzlesmile, Optimal Health Science as to Atlast Holdings served on 3/23/2010, answer due 4/13/2010. (Hardin, Jason)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dazzlesmile, Optimal Health Science as to Farend Services served on 3/23/2010, answer due 4/13/2010. (Hardin, Jason)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Verified Complaint against all defendants with Jury Demand. New Defendants: Neverblue Media, Inc.., filed by Dazzlesmile, Optimal Health Science. (Hardin, Jason)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Google, Yahoo!, Microsoft.Instructions to Counsel:1. Log into CM/ECF (Not PACER) before clicking on the document number2. Print the issued summons for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons - Microsoft, # 2 Summons - Yahoo)(jlw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dazzlesmile et al v. Epic Advertising et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dazzlesmile
Represented By: Jason W. Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Optimal Health Science
Represented By: Jason W. Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Advertising
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Azoogle.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Azoogleads US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farend Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse David Willms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1021018 Alberta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlast Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo!
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?