Google v. Pacific Webworks Featured Case
Plaintiff: Google
Defendant: Pacific Webworks
Case Number: 2:2009cv01068
Filed: December 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Bruce S. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER-granting 73 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Case Closed. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 4/11/11. (jmr)
March 24, 2011 Filing 113 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of George M. Haley and Blaine J. Benard on behalf of Google (Haley, George)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANTS BLOOSKY INTERACTIVE, LLC; 1021018 ALBERTA LTD D/B/A JUST THINK MEDIA, ONLINE CASH SUCCESS KIT, QUICK PROFIT KIT, JDW MEDIA AND EDIRECT SOFTWARE; CRUSH, LLC; HYPER INTERACTIVE MEDIA, LLC; AND SEARCH 4 PROFIT, LLC-Judgment is hereby entered against the Stipulating Defendants in the amount of $1.6 million, which has been paid or is payable to Google pursuant to the terms of separate settlement agreements between Google and each of the Stipulating Defendants, which, inter alia, specify the exact amounts and timing of the payments by each Stipulating Defendant. See Jgm/Permanent Injunction for details. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 3/24/11. (jmr)
March 22, 2011 Filing 111 **SEALED DOCUMENT** SEALED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BETWEEN GOOGLE, INC. ANDVIABLE MARKETING CORP. d/b/a VIEW MARKETING AND WEBMONEY TRAINING VIEW MARKETING, INC.re 107 Notice of Conventional Filing, filed by Plaintiff Google. (jmr)
March 22, 2011 Filing 110 **SEALED DOCUMENT** SEALED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BETWEEN GOOGLE, INC. ANDCRUSH,LLC;HYPERINTERACTIVE MEDIA, LLC; and SEARCH 4 PROFIT, LLCre 106 Notice of Conventional Filing filed by Plaintiff Google. (jmr)
March 22, 2011 Filing 109 **SEALED DOCUMENT** SEALED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BETWEEN GOOGLE, INC. AND1021018 ALBERTA LTD, d/b/a JUST THINK MEDIA, ONLINE CASH SUCCESS KIT, QUICK PROFIT KIT, JDW MEDIA and EDIRECT SOFTWARE re 105 Notice of Conventional Filing, filed by Plaintiff Google. (jmr)
March 22, 2011 Filing 108 **SEALED DOCUMENT** SEALED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTBETWEEN GOOGLE, INC. AND BLOOSKY INTERACTIVE, LLC re 104 Notice of Conventional Filing filed by Plaintiff Google. (jmr)
March 22, 2011 Filing 107 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Settlement Agreement Between Google, Inc. and Viable Marketing Corp. d/b/a View Marketing and Webmoney Training View Marketing, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Google Confidential, Subject To A Court Protective Order (Buschmann, Craig)
March 22, 2011 Filing 106 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Settlement Agreement Between Google, Inc. and Crush, LLC; Hyper Interactive Media, LLC; and Search 4 Profit, LLC filed by Plaintiff Google Confidential, Subject To A Court Protective Order (Buschmann, Craig)
March 22, 2011 Filing 105 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Settlement Agreement Between Google, Inc. and 1021018 Alberta LTD, d/b/a Just Think Media, Online Cash Success Kit, Quick Profit Kit, JDW Media and EDirect Software filed by Plaintiff Google Confidential, Subject To A Court Protective Order (Buschmann, Craig)
March 22, 2011 Filing 104 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Settlement Agreement Between Google, Inc. and Bloosky Interactive, LLC filed by Plaintiff Google Confidential, Subject To A Court Protective Order (Buschmann, Craig)
March 21, 2011 Filing 114 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins: Motion Hearing held on 3/21/2011.re: to consider form & content of the proposed stipulated final judgment &injunction, & to further consider Pacific Webworks, Inc.s motion to dismiss or transferBlodsky Interactive, LLCs third-party complaint.Argument & discussion heard. Crt recesses 2:15 PM, reconvenes 2:30 PM. Crt rules:- Dismisses, action without prejudice.- Proposed judgment amended in Crt.Cnsl to file settlement agreements under seal. Cnsl to prepare & submit order of dismissal. Mr. Mansfield to prepare order of dismissal as to Pacific Webworks. re 73 MOTION to Dismiss Bloosky's Third-Party Complaint filed by Pacific Webworks. Attorney for Plaintiff: See Minute Entry, Attorney for Defendant: See Minute Entry. Court Reporter: Ed Young.(Time Start: 1:35 PM, Time End: 2:35 PM, Room 420.) (mrw)
March 21, 2011 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Kono on behalf of Crush LLC, Hyper Interactive Media, Search 4 Profit (Kono, David)
March 18, 2011 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelley M. Marsden on behalf of Viable Marketing (Marsden, Kelley)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER re: Hearing set for 3/21/11 at 1:30 p.m. See order for details. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 3/3/11. (jmr)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE STIPULATED JUDGMENT-granting Stipulated 96 Motion for Extension of Time upto 3/2/11 to file the fully executed Stipulated Judgment. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 2/24/11. (jmr)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION- granting 98 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Karl S. Kronenberger for Google. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 3/24/11. (jmr)
February 24, 2011 Filing 98 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Karl S. Kronenberger, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1298824, filed by Defendant 1021018 Alberta. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - PHV Application, # 2 Exhibit B - ECF Application, # 3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Anderson, Sammi)
February 24, 2011 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Sammi V. Anderson on behalf of 1021018 Alberta (Anderson, Sammi)
February 23, 2011 Filing 96 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time To File Stipulated Judgment filed by Plaintiff Google. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buschmann, Craig)
February 23, 2011 Filing 95 NOTICE of SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Pacific Webworks Regarding WebWorks' Motion to Dismiss Bloosky's Third-Party Complaint [Dkt. No. 73] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supplemental Authority) (Mansfield, Robert)
February 23, 2011 Filing 94 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended Complaint) against Bloosky Interactive, LLC, CPA Upsell, IWorks, Pacific Webworks, Viable Marketing, Virgin Offers Media International, Wealth Tools International, www.goog-money-tree.com, www.googlemoneyprofitsystem.com with Jury Demand. New Defendants: Crush, LLC; Hyper Interactive Media, LLC; Search 4 Profit, LLC; Viable Marketing Corp. dba View Marketing and WebMoney Training View Marketing, Inc; 1021018 Alberta Ltd dba Just Think Media; Online Cash Success Kit; Quick Profit Kit; JDW Media and eDirect Software, as Does 2-6., filed by Google. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - New York Gazette-Steadman-David, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Check, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Check, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Check, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Net News Daily-Steadman-Kevin, # 6 Exhibit 6 - New York Gazette-SLC, # 7 Exhibit 7 - GoogleAdwork, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Credit Card Order Site Samples, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Navigate Away, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Consumer Complaints, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Google TM Regs, # 12 Exhibit 12 - ADWORDS TM Reg, # 13 Exhibit 13 - Infringing Domain List, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21) (Benard, Blaine) Modified on 2/24/2011 to reflect that third-party defendants were incorrectly chosen when this Second Amended Complaint was filed (ce).
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER-IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: that Google is to file a Second Amended Complaint naming additional Doe Dfts by 2/23/11. Google, Bloosky, and other settling Dfts are to file a Proposed Stipulated Jgm and Permanent Injunction by 2/23/11. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court reserves judgment on Pacific Web Works' Motion to Dismiss Bloosky's Third-Party Complaint until after 2/23/11. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 2/1/11. (jmr)
January 26, 2011 Filing 93 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins: Further,Conference held on 1/26/2011. Cnsl report settlement almost completed. Crt schedules:- Cnsl to file items identified on the record nlt 2/23/2011.Pla cnsl to file stip order. Attorney for Plaintiff: See Minute Entry, Attorney for Defendant: See Minute Entry. Court Reporter: Kellie Peterson.(Time Start: 930 AM, Time End: 9:50 AM, Room 420.) (mrw)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW-granting 90 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kenneth C. White withdrawn from case for Bloosky Interactive, LLC. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 1/10/11. (jmr)
January 6, 2011 Filing 90 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendant Bloosky Interactive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(White, Kenneth)
December 15, 2010 Filing 89 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins: Motion Hearing held on 12/15/2010 re 73 MOTION to Dismiss Bloosky's Third-Party Complaint filed by Pacific Webworks, Status Report & Scheduling Conference held on 12/15/2010. Argument & discussion heard. Crt rules:- Reserves (takes under advisement) motion to dismiss.Crt schedules:- Further, status report & scheduling conference set 1/26/2011, at 9:30 AM. Attorney for Plaintiff: See Minute Entry, Attorney for Defendant: See Minute Entry. Court Reporter: Michelle Mallonee.(Time Start: 1:30 PM, Time End: 2:40 PM, Room 420.) (mrw)
November 10, 2010 Filing 88 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins: Status Report & Scheduling Conference Conference held on 11/10/2010. Cnsl report that settlement negotiations are continuing. Crt schedules:- Continues, Status Report & Scheduling Conference &/or Motion to Dismiss set 12/15/2010, at 1:30 PM. Attorney for Plaintiff: See Minute Entry, Attorney for Defendant: See Minute Entry. Court Reporter: Kellie Peterson.(Time Start: 9:30 AM, Time End: 9:40 AM, Room 420.) (mrw)
November 9, 2010 Filing 87 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re 73 MOTION to Dismiss Bloosky's Third-Party Complaint filed by ThirdParty Defendant Pacific Webworks. (Mansfield, Robert)
November 1, 2010 Filing 86 REPLY to Response to Motion re 73 MOTION to Dismiss Bloosky's Third-Party Complaint filed by ThirdParty Defendant Pacific Webworks. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Mansfield, Robert)
October 13, 2010 Filing 85 RESPONSE to Motion re 73 MOTION to Dismiss Bloosky's Third-Party Complaint filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff Bloosky Interactive, LLC, Defendant Bloosky Interactive, LLC. (Kimrey, Blaine)
October 5, 2010 Filing 84 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins: Motion Hearing held on 10/5/2010 re 78 Stipulated MOTION to amend Scheduling Order filed by Pacific Webworks, Google, Bloosky Interactive, LLC. Cnsl report that settlement negotiations underway. Crt schedules:- Continues, status report & scheduling conference set 11/10/2010, at 9:30 AM. Attorney for Plaintiff: George M. Haley, Attorney for Defendant: Gregory J. Christiansen, Blair R Jackson, Blaine C. Kimrey (via Phone), Todd M. Shaughnessy. Court Reporter: Dawn Brunner-Hahn.(Time Start: 1:15 PM, Time End: 1:20 PM, Room 420.) (mrw)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 81 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Travis W. McCallon for Bloosky Interactive, LLC,Travis W. McCallon for Bloosky Interactive, LLC. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 10/4/10. (jmr)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting 80 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 73 MOTION to Dismiss Bloosky's Third-Party Complaint. Responses due by 10/13/2010. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 9/28/2010. (ce)
September 29, 2010 Filing 81 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Travis W. McCallon, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1205447, filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff Bloosky Interactive, LLC. (Christiansen, Gregory)
September 24, 2010 Filing 80 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 73 MOTION to Dismiss Bloosky's Third-Party Complaint filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff Bloosky Interactive, LLC, Defendant Bloosky Interactive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Bryan)
September 24, 2010 Filing 79 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: 78 Stipulated MOTION for Scheduling Order : Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2010 01:15 PM in Room 420 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. (kms)
September 23, 2010 Filing 78 Stipulated MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff Bloosky Interactive, LLC, Defendant Bloosky Interactive, LLC, Plaintiff Google, ThirdParty Defendant Pacific Webworks. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Amended Scheduling Order)(Kimrey, Blaine)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER re 76 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Third Party Complaint Without Prejudice as to Third-Party Defendants Viable Marketing Corp dba View Marketing, Wealth Tools International, Virgin Offers Media International, IWorks and CPA Upsell filed by Bloosky Interactive, LLC. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 9/9/2010. (ce)
September 1, 2010 Filing 76 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Viable Marketing Corp., Wealth Tools International, Virgin Offers Media International, IWorks, and CPA Upsell filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff Bloosky Interactive, LLC (Clark, Bryan)
September 1, 2010 Filing 75 DECLARATION of Robert E. Mansfield re 73 MOTION to Dismiss Bloosky's Third-Party Complaint filed by Pacific Webworks. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Mansfield, Robert)
September 1, 2010 Filing 74 MEMORANDUM in Support re 73 MOTION to Dismiss Bloosky's Third-Party Complaint filed by ThirdParty Defendant Pacific Webworks. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Mansfield, Robert)
September 1, 2010 Filing 73 MOTION to Dismiss Bloosky's Third-Party Complaint filed by ThirdParty Defendant Pacific Webworks. (Mansfield, Robert)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER FOR PRO HAC VICE-granting 70 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of A. Jeff Ifrah for Viable Marketing. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 8/11/10. (jmr)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION-granting 69 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amy M. Lloyd for Viable Marketing. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 8/11/10. (jmr)
August 6, 2010 Filing 70 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of A. Jeff Ifrah, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1170970, filed by ThirdParty Defendant Viable Marketing. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A -- Application, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B -- Registration Form, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit C -- Proposed Order)(Weiss, Loren)
August 6, 2010 Filing 69 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amy M. Lloyd, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1170959, filed by ThirdParty Defendant Viable Marketing. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A -- Application, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B -- Registration Form, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit C -- Proposed Order)(Weiss, Loren)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION-granting 64 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Blaine C. Kimrey for Bloosky Interactive, LLC,Blaine C. Kimrey for Bloosky Interactive, LLC. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 8/4/10. (jmr)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION-granting 63 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bryan K. Clark for Bloosky Interactive, LLC,Bryan K. Clark for Bloosky Interactive, LLC. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 8/4/10. (jmr)
August 4, 2010 Filing 66 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons on a Third-Party Complaint Issued Electronically as to CPA Upsell, IWorks, Pacific Webworks, Viable Marketing, Virgin Offers Media International, Wealth Tools International. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons - Iworks, # 2 Summons - Virgin Offers Media, # 3 Summons - Wealth Tools, # 4 Summons - Pacific Webworks, # 5 Summons - Viable Marketing)(jlw)
July 30, 2010 Filing 65 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Bloosky Interactive, LLC identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Christiansen, Gregory)
July 30, 2010 Filing 64 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Blaine C. Kimrey, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1166215, filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff Bloosky Interactive, LLC. (Christiansen, Gregory)
July 30, 2010 Filing 63 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bryan K. Clark, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1166207, filed by Defendant Bloosky Interactive, LLC. (Christiansen, Gregory)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2010. Joinder of Parties due by 9/30/2010. Discovery due by 4/1/2011. Motions due by 9/30/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2011 09:30 AM in Room 420 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/15/2011. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 7/20/10. (jmr)
July 16, 2010 Filing 60 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Pacific Webworks, Viable Marketing, Wealth Tools International, Virgin Offers Media International, IWorks, CPA Upsell (Electronic document provided on disc: original file stamped and signed document permanently retained), filed by Bloosky Interactive, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (alt)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION-granting 58 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kenneth C. White for Bloosky Interactive, LLC. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 7/8/10. (jmr)
July 7, 2010 Filing 58 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kenneth C. White, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1150663, filed by Defendant Bloosky Interactive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Jackson, Blair)
July 2, 2010 Filing 57 ANSWER to 44 Amended Complaint filed by Bloosky Interactive, LLC.(Jackson, Blair)
June 29, 2010 Filing 56 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Bialecki, Scott)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 54 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 44 Amended Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Bloosky Interactive, LLC answer due 7/2/2010. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 6/28/2010. (rlr)
June 25, 2010 Filing 54 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant Bloosky Interactive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, Blair)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT BLOOSKY INTERACTIVE, LLC'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMEND COMPLAINT-granting 52 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Answer deadline updated for Bloosky Interactive, LLC. Answer due 6/25/2010. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 6/14/10. (jmr)
June 11, 2010 Filing 52 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 44 Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Bloosky Interactive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, Blair)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE THE INITIAL STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A WRITTEN RULE 26(f) REPORT- re 41 Stipulated MOTION to Continue The Initial Status and Scheduling Conference and for Extension of Time to File a Written Rule 26(f) Report filed by Google, Motions terminated: 41 Stipulated MOTION to Continue The Initial Status and Scheduling Conference and for Extension of Time to File a Written Rule 26(f) Report filed by Google., ( Form due by 6/17/2010., Initial Status Report and Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2010 01:30 AM in Room 420 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins.) A written report shall be filed with the court no later than ten days prior to the above-scheduled hearing date.. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 6/2/10. (jmr)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PROTECTIVE ORDER-re: Confidentiality of discovery materials. See order for details. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 6/2/10. (jmr)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT PACIFIC WEBWORKS, INC ET AL. Motions terminated: 46 Stipulated MOTION for Entry of Judgment and Order For Permanent Injunction Against Defendant Pacific Webworks, Inc., et al. filed by Google. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 6/2/10. (jmr)
May 28, 2010 Filing 51 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins: Motion Hearing held on 5/28/2010.Discussion heard. Crt executes modified stip order for protective order & modified stip order for extension of time & continue. Crt schedules:- Continues, status report & scheduling conference set 7/9/2010, at 1:30 PM. re 37 Stipulated MOTION to Continue The Initial Status and Scheduling Conference And Extension of Time to File a Written Rule 26(f) Report filed by Google, 36 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order filed by Google. Attorney for Plaintiff: Craig A. Buschmann, George M. Haley, Attorney for Defendant: Daniel Jackson. Court Reporter: Ray Fenlon.(Time Start: 11:30 AM, Time End: 11:40 AM, Room 420.) (mrw)
May 24, 2010 Filing 47 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Google as to Bloosky Interactive, LLC served on 5/21/2010, answer due 6/11/2010. (Haley, George)
May 24, 2010 Filing 46 Stipulated MOTION for Entry of Judgment and Order For Permanent Injunction Against Defendant Pacific Webworks, Inc., et al. filed by Plaintiff Google. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Text of Proposed Order)(Haley, George)
May 19, 2010 Filing 45 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Bloosky Interactive, LLC. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jlw)
May 18, 2010 Filing 44 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bloosky Interactive, LLC, Pacific Webworks with Jury Demand., filed by Google. Filed per order 43 . (jmr)
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT-granting Stipulated 40 Motion to Amend/Correct. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is granted and Plaintiff Google's First Amended Complaint attached as Exhibit A to the Parties' Motion is deemed filed and entered as of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 5/18/10. (jmr)
May 18, 2010 Filing 42 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION RE: TO CONSIDER 41 Stipulated MOTION to Continue The Initial Status and Scheduling Conference and for Extension of Time to File a Written Rule 26(f) Report : Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2010 11:30 AM in Room 420 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. (kms)
May 17, 2010 Filing 41 Stipulated MOTION to Continue The Initial Status and Scheduling Conference and for Extension of Time to File a Written Rule 26(f) Report filed by Plaintiff Google. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haley, George)
May 17, 2010 Filing 40 Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Plaintiff Google. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - Text of Proposed Order)(Haley, George)
May 17, 2010 Filing 39 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION RE: TO CONSIDER 36 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2010 11:30 AM in Room 420 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. (kms)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE THE INITIAL STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A WRITTEN RULE 26(f) REPORT- ( Status Report and Scheduling Conference re-set for 5/28/2010 11:30 AM in Room 420 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins.), Motions terminated: 37 Stipulated MOTION to Continue The Initial Status and Scheduling Conference And Extension of Time to File a Written Rule 26(f) Report filed by Google. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 4/12/10. (jmr)
April 9, 2010 Filing 37 Stipulated MOTION to Continue The Initial Status and Scheduling Conference And Extension of Time to File a Written Rule 26(f) Report filed by Plaintiff Google. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buschmann, Craig)
February 3, 2010 Filing 32 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Google, Defendant Pacific Webworks, Movants www.goog-money-tree.com, www.googlemoneyprofitsystem.com. (jmr)
February 3, 2010 Filing 31 MOTION to Withdraw 27 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Movant www.goog-money-tree.com. (Christiansen, Gregory)
January 27, 2010 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Pacific Webworks.(Shaughnessy, Todd)
January 25, 2010 Filing 30 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of objection to subpeona from mygooglefortune.com. Lodged per chambers(RK). (jmr)
January 25, 2010 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support re 27 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Movant www.goog-money-tree.com. and by Movant www.googlemoneyprofitsystem.com (Christiansen, Gregory) Modified on 1/26/2010 to add www.googlemoneyprofitsystem.com as Movant (jmr).
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scott R. Bialecki for Google. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 12/8/09. (jmr)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Roger R. Myers for Google. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 12/8/09. (jmr)
December 7, 2009 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Pacific Webworks.Instructions to Counsel:1. Log into CM/ECF (Not PACER) before clicking on the document number2. Print the issued summons for service. (tls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Google v. Pacific Webworks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Google
Represented By: George M. Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Webworks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?