Johnson v. Sector 10 et al

Plaintiff: Edward Johnson
Defendant: Sector 10, Sector 10 Holdings, Pericles Deavila and Larry Madison
Case Number: 2:2010cv00092
Filed: February 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Summit
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:0077 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 123 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 08/15/2013. (asp)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 124 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ; 5 Day Jury Trial set for 11/18/2013 08:30 AM in Room 150 (Clerks Office) before Judge Dale A. Kimball. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 07/03/2013. (asp)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 109 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 03/18/2013. (asp)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: denying 77 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 81 Motion for Protective Order. The Individual Defendants must appear for their depositions by October 19, 2012, and, if they do not, Plaintiffs counsel may file a Motion to Compel and for sanctions. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 9/24/12. (jlw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Sector 10 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Johnson
Represented By: Michael L. Deamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sector 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sector 10 Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pericles Deavila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?