Public Engines v. Reportsee Featured Case
Plaintiff: Public Engines
Defendant: Reportsee
Case Number: 2:2010cv00317
Filed: April 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1030
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 62 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice - CASE CLOSED. Magistrate Judge Samuel Alba no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 12/6/10 (alt)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 61 Motion for Permanent Injunction: Stipulated Permanent Injunction entered for Plaintiff, enjoining Defendant and related entities. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 12/6/10 (alt)
December 2, 2010 Modification of Docketre 61 MOTION for Entry of Judgment Permanent Injunction. Error: Filer selected the wrong motion relief. Correction: Switched motion relief to match the relief requested in the pleading. (alt)
December 2, 2010 Filing 62 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Public Engines. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shaughnessy, Todd)
December 2, 2010 Filing 61 Stipulated MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Plaintiff Public Engines. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shaughnessy, Todd) Modified on 12/6/2010: corrected motion relief (alt)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 59 Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order; granting 59 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 57 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Discovery MOTION for Sanctions, 55 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint: Oppositions due by 12/15/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Samuel Alba on 11/10/10 (alt)
November 9, 2010 Modification of Docket re 59 MOTION for Amended Scheduling Order MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Error: Motion requesting two different reliefs was filed with only one relief selected. Correction: The second relief has been added to the motion and the first relief corrected. (alt)
November 9, 2010 Filing 59 Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order and Extend Deadlines for Pending Motions filed by Plaintiff Public Engines. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Samuel Alba.(Shaughnessy, Todd) Modified on 11/10/2010 ; changed relief from for Extension of Time to to Amend/Correct (asp). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [55} Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, 57 Motion to Compel Discovery Motion for Sanctions, on 11/15/2010 (alt)
November 2, 2010 Filing 58 Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Support re 57 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Discovery MOTION for Sanctions filed by Defendant Reportsee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Hunt, Jeffrey)
November 2, 2010 Filing 57 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Discovery, MOTION for Sanctions filed by Defendant Reportsee. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Samuel Alba.(Hunt, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2010 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM in Support re 55 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Public Engines. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Haws, J.)
October 29, 2010 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Public Engines. Motions referred to Samuel Alba.(Haws, J.)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 53 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Pamela K. Riewerts for Reportsee. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 10/1/10 (alt)
October 1, 2010 Filing 53 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Pamela K. Riewerts, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1207665, filed by Defendant Reportsee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Application, # 2 Exhibit B: Proposed Order)(Reymann, David)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 51 Motion for Scheduling Order: Amended Pleadings due by 10/29/2010. Joinder of Parties due by 10/29/2010. Discovery due by 1/28/2011. Motions due by 12/15/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/10/2011 03:00 PM in Room 230 before Judge Tena Campbell. 3-day Jury Trial set for 5/31/2011 08:30 AM in Room 230 before Judge Tena Campbell. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 7/28/10 (alt)
July 21, 2010 Filing 51 Stipulated MOTION for Scheduling Order and Request for Trial Setting filed by Plaintiff Public Engines. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Samuel Alba.(Shaughnessy, Todd)
June 24, 2010 Filing 50 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION against Defendant, granting 48 Stipulated MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 6/24/10 (alt)
June 24, 2010 Filing 49 NOTICE: VACATING MOTION HEARING SET FOR 06/28/2010 @ 10:00 A.M. (tab)
June 24, 2010 Filing 48 Stipulated MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Public Engines. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shaughnessy, Todd)
June 16, 2010 Deadlines/Hearings terminated. An email from Mr. Alan Sullivan indicates the parties have agreed to the hearing date of 6/28/2010 at 10:00 a.m. to hear the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Therefore the status conference set for 6/17/2010 at 1:15p.m. is stricken from the calendar. Mary Jane McNamee, Case Administrator (mjm)
June 11, 2010 Filing 47 NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) Status Conference set for 6/17/2010 at 1:15 PM in Room 230 before Judge Tena Campbell. Conference will be held in courtroom at 350 South Main Street, Salt Lake City, Utah. (mjm)
June 11, 2010 Filing 46 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) Motion Hearing RESET for 6/28/2010 AT 10:00 AM in Room 230 before Judge Tena Campbell. Please Note: Motion hearing has been reset to 6/28/2010 at 10:00 a.m. (mjm)
June 8, 2010 Filing 45 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) Motion Hearing RESET for 6/22/2010 AT 10:00 AM in Room 230 before Judge Tena Campbell. Please Note: Hearing date and time have changed to 6/22/2010 at 10:00 AM. Mary Jane McNamee, Case Administrator. (mjm)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 43 Motion to Unseal Document 40 Reply Memo in Support of 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 6/5/10 (alt)
June 1, 2010 Filing 43 Joint MOTION to Unseal Document 40 Sealed Document filed by Public Engines filed by Plaintiff Public Engines. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to LIft Seal of Plaintiff's "Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaitniff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction") Motions referred to Samuel Alba.(Haws, J.)
May 26, 2010 Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT of Greg Whisenant in Support re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Public Engines. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Sullivan, Alan)
May 26, 2010 Filing 41 **SEALED DOCUMENT** SEALED DECLARATION OF J ELIZABETH HAWS IN SUPPORT OF 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Public Engines (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibits 2-5, # 3 Exhibits 6-7, # 4 Exhibits 8-10, # 5 Exhibits 11-12) (alt)
May 25, 2010 Filing 40 **UNSEALED DOCUMENT** REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Public Engines (alt) Modified on 6/7/2010: unsealed per 44 Order (alt)
May 25, 2010 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT of Steven Meyers in Support re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Public Engines. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Sullivan, Alan)
May 25, 2010 Filing 38 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Public Engines (Sullivan, Alan)
May 25, 2010 Filing 37 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Declaration of J. Elizabeth Haws in Support of Reply Memorandum in Support of Public Engines' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Public Engines (Sullivan, Alan)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 5/25/10 (alt)
May 25, 2010 Filing 35 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Plaintiff Public Engines. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Overlength Reply Memorandum in Support of Public Engine's Motion for Preliminary Injunction) Motions referred to Samuel Alba.(Sullivan, Alan)
May 14, 2010 Filing 34 **SEALED DOCUMENT** SEALED EXHIBIT TO 32 Memorandum in Opposition to 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Defendant Reportsee (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (alt)
May 14, 2010 Filing 33 ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Reportsee.(Glikin, Joshua)
May 14, 2010 Filing 32 Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Reportsee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Reymann, David)
May 14, 2010 Filing 31 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Submission Under Seal of Confidential Exhibit to Defendant's Memorandum Opposing Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Reportsee (Reymann, David)
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 5/13/10 (alt)
May 13, 2010 Filing 29 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re: Memorandum Opposing Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Reportsee. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Samuel Alba.(Reymann, David)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 22 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Samuel Alba on 5/4/10 (Attachments: # 1 Checklist for Filing Documents Under Seal) (alt)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 21 Motion for Discovery Plan; granting 21 Motion for Scheduling Order: Discovery due by 4/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Samuel Alba on 5/4/10 (alt)
May 4, 2010 Set Deadlines as to 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction per 27 Order: Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2010 10:00 AM in Room 230 before Judge Tena Campbell (alt)
May 3, 2010 Filing 26 Modification of Docket: re 24 Notice of Appearance. Error: Document was filed using the wrong attorney information. Correction: Document has been refiled 25 by counsel using the correct attorney information. (las)
May 3, 2010 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Elizabeth Haws on behalf of Public Engines (Haws, J.)
May 3, 2010 Filing 24 ENTRY ERROR- Document filed for wrong attorney. Document refiled as 25 Notice of Appearance for J. Elizabeth Haws. NOTICE of Appearance by Alan L. Sullivan on behalf of Public Engines (Sullivan, Alan) Modified on 5/3/2010 (las).
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Samuel Alba under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. Motions referred to Samuel Alba. So ordered by Judge Tena Campbell on 5/3/10 (alt) Modified on 5/3/2010: text corrected to clarify that this is a docket text order only - no attached document (alt)
May 3, 2010 Modification of Docket re 23 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Error: Text did not clarify that the referral order is a docket text order only. Correction: Text modified to clarify the order is 'docket text only - no document attached'. (alt)
April 29, 2010 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Public Engines. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Shaughnessy, Todd)
April 27, 2010 Filing 21 Stipulated MOTION for Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Public Engines. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Alan)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joshua A. Glikin for Reportsee. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 4/20/2010. (rlr)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Walter E. Diercks for Reportsee. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 4/20/2010. (rlr)
April 19, 2010 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Walter E. Diercks and Consent of Local Counsel, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 10880000000001096513, filed by Defendant Reportsee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Application and Efiling Registration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reymann, David)
April 19, 2010 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joshua A. Glikin and Consent of Local Counsel, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 10880000000001096491, filed by Defendant Reportsee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Application and Efiling Registration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reymann, David)
April 14, 2010 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Tena Campbell: Status Conference held on 4/14/2010. The Court hears from cnsl. Stipulation read into the record. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2010 at 10:00 AM as to 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Attorney for Plaintiff: Alan Sullivan, Todd Shaughnessy, Attorney for Defendant David Reiman. Court Reporter: Ray Fenlon.(mjm)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark F. Lambert for Public Engines. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 4/14/2010. (rlr)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark R. Weinstein for Public Engines. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 4/14/2010. (rlr)
April 14, 2010 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Hunt on behalf of Reportsee (Hunt, Jeffrey)
April 14, 2010 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Reymann on behalf of Reportsee (Reymann, David)
April 14, 2010 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark R. Weinstein, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 10880000000001093662, filed by Plaintiff Public Engines. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit B Electronic Case Filing Registration, # 3 Exhibit C Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Alan)
April 14, 2010 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark F. Lambert, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 10880000000001093648, filed by Plaintiff Public Engines. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit B Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, # 3 Exhibit C Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Alan)
April 13, 2010 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Motion for Preliminary Injunction & Memo in Support, Declarations of G. Whisenant and S. Meyers for ReportSee, Inc. served on Ms. Jasmine on April 12, 2010, filed by Plaintiff Public Engines. (Sullivan, Alan)
April 12, 2010 Filing 8 NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) Status Conference set for 4/14/2010 at 2:00 PM in Room 230 before Judge Tena Campbell. (mjm)
April 12, 2010 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Reportsee.Instructions to Counsel:1. Log into CM/ECF (Not PACER) before clicking on the document number2. Print the issued summons for service. (tls)
April 12, 2010 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Mark Lambert and Mark Weinstein, for Plaintiff Public Engines (tls)
April 9, 2010 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Steven Meyers in Support re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Public Engines. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9, # 2 Exhibit 10 (first 14 pages), # 3 Exhibit 10 (last 14 pages), # 4 Exhibit 11) (Document provided electronically to preserve color exhibits. Original file stamped and signed document is permanently retained) (alt)
April 9, 2010 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Greg Whisenant in Support re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff Public Engines (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibits 2-3, # 3 Exhibits 4-6, # 4 Exhibits 7-8) (Document provided electronically to preserve color exhibits. Original file stamped and signed document is permanently retained) (alt)
April 9, 2010 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Public Engines (alt)
April 9, 2010 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Public Engines (alt)
April 9, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Reportsee (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4681036666), filed by Public Engines. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (tls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Public Engines v. Reportsee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Public Engines
Represented By: Todd M. Shaughnessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reportsee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?