Willett v. Turley et al
Plaintiff: |
Duane Willett |
Defendant: |
Steven Turley and Mike Haddon |
Case Number: |
2:2010cv00382 |
Filed: |
April 29, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Utah |
Office: |
Central Office |
County: |
Salt Lake |
Presiding Judge: |
Dale A. Kimball |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 26, 2013 |
Filing
90
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 53 Motion to Reconsider Plaintiffs Eight Amendment Claim re 50 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Memorandum Decision ; denying 58 Plaintiff's Motion for Action ; granting in part (with respect to Item C in his First Request for Production of Documents - Doc. No. 75) and denying in part 81 Motion to Compel; granting 86 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants may file a reply brief within fourteen days after Plaintiff's opposition memorandum is filed. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 2/26/13. (jlw)
|
March 6, 2012 |
Filing
50
MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion to Dismiss ; denying 23 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 03/05/12. (jlw)
|
July 8, 2011 |
Filing
25
MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER:granting 15 Motion to cure deficiencies regarding his amended complaint; finding/Denied as moot 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend; (see Docket entry #17) Plaintiffs Second amended complaint has already been fi led and accepted by the court; granting 24 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). The United States Marshals Service shall serve a summons, a copy of Plaintiffs complaint, and a copy of this Order upon Defendants Sharon Damico, Colleen Gabbitas , Tom E. Patterson, Steven Turley. The United States Marshals Service shall serve a completed summons, a copy of the Second Amended Complaint (see docket #21) and a copy of this Order upon the above listed defendants. 5) Within twenty days of being s erved, Defendants must file an answer or motion to dismiss and proposed order, as outlined above. 6) If filing on exhaustion or any other basis a Martinez Report with a summary judgment motion and proposed order, Defendant must do so within ninety da ys of filing their answer. 7) If served with a Martinez report and a summary judgment motion or motion to dismiss, Plaintiff may file a response within thirty days. 8) Summary judgment motion deadline is ninety days from filing of answer.. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 07/07/2011. (kpf)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?