Kirkbride v. Terex USA et al

Plaintiff: Larry Kirkbride
Defendant: Terex USA and Terex Corp
Case Number: 2:2010cv00660
Filed: July 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 271 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 261 Motion to Review Taxation of Costs: the Court allows total costs of $17,975.61. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 5/29/14 (alt)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 173 Motion for Clarification on Plaintiff's Witnesses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 9/11/13 (alt)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 80 Motion in Limine to Limit and Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Health Care Professionals. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 9/10/13 (alt)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 64 Motion to Strike 54 Expert Report of James F. Bowman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 9/10/13 (alt)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 128 Motion in Limine to Exclude Belatedly Produced Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 9/9/13 (alt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirkbride v. Terex USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Kirkbride
Represented By: John C. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terex USA
Represented By: P. Bryan Fishburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terex Corp
Represented By: P. Bryan Fishburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?