Payne v. Herman et al
Plaintiff: Paul Richard Payne
Defendant: Bryant Herman, Tom Anderson, Blake Neilsen, Rick Brown, Billie Casper and Steven Turley
Case Number: 2:2010cv00684
Filed: July 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Bruce S. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order granting 25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; denying 32 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 9/12/12. (jlw)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER: Directing service of process, answer and/or Dispositive motion. It is hereby ordered that: 1) the United States Marshals Service shall serve a completed summons, a copy of the Amended Complaint, and a copy of this Order upon the above listed defendants. 3) Within twenty days of being served, Defendants must file answers or a motion to dismiss and proposed order, as outlined above. 4) If filing a Martinez report with a summary judgment motion and proposed order, Def endants must do so within ninety days of filing their answers. 5) If served with a Martinez report and a summary judgment motion or motion to dismiss, Plaintiff may file a response within thirty days. 6)Summary-Judgment motion deadline is ninety days from filing of answer. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 09/27/2011. (kpf)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO AMEND DEFICIENT AMENDED COMPLAINT re 11 Amended Complaint filed by Paul Richard Payne. Defendant shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this order to cure the deficiencies noted in this order. If Plaintiff fails to timely cure the deficiencies according to the instructions this action will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 6/20/2011. (rlr)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO AMEND DEFICIENT COMPLAINT re 3 Complaint, filed by Paul Richard Payne. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to cure the deficiencies noted in this order. The Clerk's office shall mail Plaintiff a copy of the Pro Se Litigant Guide; and, if Plaintiff fails to timely cure the above deficiencies according to the instructions here this action will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 9/12/2010. (rlr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne v. Herman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Richard Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Neilsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billie Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?