Kane County v. USA

Plaintiff: Kane County
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 2:2010cv01073
Filed: October 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Kane
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:2409
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 469 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER-denying 456 Motion re: Bellwether Routes Site Visit. The court concludes a site visit will produce relevant evidence and is an important part of the court's ability to understand and place in context the evidence presented at trial. Therefore the court overrules the objection SUWAs Motion sets forth. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 10/5/18. (jmr)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 394 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER-granting 368 Motion to Quash; denying 377 Motion to Strike. It authorizes SUWA to file a subpoena tailored to the fifteen roads now at issue in the bellwether trial. If SUWA issues such a subpoena and the State believes some documents are protected by a privilege, the State may raise such objections at that time. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 5/9/18. (jmr)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER ASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE CLARK WADDOUPS FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 1/26/2018. (jwt)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 211 Certification of Issue to State Supreme Court. For the foregoing reasons, the court hereby ORDERS that, pursuant to Rule 41 of the Utah Rules of Appellate Procedure, the following question is certified to the Utah Supreme Court: A re Utah Code § 78B-2-201(1) and its predecessor statutes of limitations or statutes of repose?It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court shall transmit a copy of this certification to the parties and shall submit to the Utah Supreme Court a certified copy of this certification. Should the Utah Supreme Court determine that all or any portion of the record be filed with the Court, this court further orders the Clerk shall transmit the requested records. Signed by Judges David Nuffer, Clark Waddoups, Robert J. Shelby on 4/17/2015.(jwt)
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 34 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 12/28/2011. (asp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kane County v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kane County
Represented By: Mark L. Burghardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?