Tanner et al v. Johnston et al

Plaintiff: Patricia Tanner and Tjinta Estates
Defendant: H&S Investments, Justin Johnston, Heath Johnston, Craig Lewis, Timothy Ross and American Commercial Real Estate Specialists Group
Case Number: 2:2011cv00028
Filed: January 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:0078
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 81 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying as moot 85 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying without prejudice 86 Motion to Amend/Correct ; granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot 96 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 07/17/2013. (asp)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 59 Motion to Compel. The NAI Defendants must comply by February 1, 2013 because that is the current fact discovery deadline. Plaintiffs request for reasonable expenses pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(5)(A) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 1/10/13. (ss)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 52 Motion to Compel the Settlement Agreement Between Plaintiffs and the Johnston Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 1/8/13. (ss)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 27 Motion to Strike. 12/8/11 Hearing is stricken. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 12/2/11 (alt)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for H&S Investments answer due 5/16/2011; Heath Johnston answer due 5/16/2011; Justin Johnston answer due 5/16/2011; Craig Lewis answer due 5/16/2011; Timothy Ross answer due 5/16/2011. denying as moot 10 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 5/23/2011. (las)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tanner et al v. Johnston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&S Investments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heath Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Commercial Real Estate Specialists Group
Represented By: Stewart O. Peay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Tanner
Represented By: Dennis V. Dahle
Represented By: Keith A. Call
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tjinta Estates
Represented By: Keith A. Call
Represented By: Dennis V. Dahle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?