Crawford v. Sandy, City of et al
Plaintiff: Brad Crawford
Defendant: Sandy, City of and Ryan Metcalf
Case Number: 2:2011cv00351
Filed: April 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting 102 Motion to Rule on Objections in Videotaped Deposition of Officer Jesse Frampton. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 09/11/2012. (tls)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 79 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 09/11/2012. (asp)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 09/07/2012. (tls)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting 40 Defendants' Motion in Limine to Limit Scope of Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Testimony. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 07/18/2012. (tls)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Ordergranting 25 Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Prior Arrest and Settlement. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 12/22/2011. (tls)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. Sandy, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Metcalf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Crawford
Represented By: Gregory W. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?