PowerHour v. Brain Swell Media
Plaintiff: PowerHour
Defendant: Brain Swell Media
Case Number: 2:2011cv00356
Filed: April 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Summit
Presiding Judge: David Sam
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 32 Motion to Stay. The parties are directed to take the necessary steps to arbitrate as per the parties' agreement, and report to the court within 30 days of any disposition resulting from arbitration proceedings. Signed by Judge David Sam on 2/23/12. (jmr)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 17 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge David Sam on 10/4/11. (jmr)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Power Hour has twenty days from the date of this order to (1) amend its complaint to clearly plead diversity or (2) to show why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 4/20/2011. (jtj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PowerHour v. Brain Swell Media
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PowerHour
Represented By: R. Lee Saber
Represented By: John H. Bogart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brain Swell Media
Represented By: Terry E. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?