Majors v. Thomas Jefferson School of Law et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Jesse Anne Majors
Defendant: Thomas Jefferson School of Law, Rudy Hasl, Jeffrey Joseph, Beth Kransberger, Eric Mitnick, Julie Garrett, Claire Wright, Joy Delman, Julie Cromer-Young, Arnold Rosenberg, Jane Larrington, Patrick Meyer, Lisa Ferreira, Angela Bayne, Jan Dauss, Lisa Chigos, Catherine Dean and All Members of the Ethics Committee of Thomas Jefferson School of Law 2006-2011
Case Number: 2:2011cv00558
Filed: June 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Samuel Alba
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2011 Filing 19 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Lodged Return of Service Unexecuted re: Improperly Issued Summons. Document is over-length and has not been scanned. Document will be kept for permanent retention. (jmr)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER- denying 15 Motion to request E-file access filed by Plaintiff Jesse Anne Majors. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Samuel Alba on 7/11/11. (jmr)
July 8, 2011 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re 15 MOTION to request E-file access filed by Defendant Thomas Jefferson School of Law. (Wilde, Robert)
July 8, 2011 Filing 16 Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Memo Supporting Objection to Dft's Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Thomas Jefferson School of Law. (Wilde, Robert)
July 8, 2011 Filing 15 MOTION to request E-file access filed by Plaintiff Jesse Anne Majors. Motions referred to Samuel Alba.(jmr)
July 8, 2011 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Memo Supporting Objection to Dft's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Jesse Anne Majors. Motions referred to Samuel Alba.(jmr)
July 8, 2011 Filing 13 RESPONSE re 11 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jesse Anne Majors. (jmr)
July 5, 2011 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re 3 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Thomas Jefferson School of Law. (Wilde, Robert)
July 5, 2011 Filing 11 Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Defendant Thomas Jefferson School of Law. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's amended complaint)(Wilde, Robert)
June 29, 2011 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Jesse Anne Majors. (jmr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2011: # 1 Complete Image) (jmr).
June 29, 2011 Filing 9 OBJECTIONS to 3 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jesse Anne Majors. (jmr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2011: # 1 Complete Image) (jmr).
June 29, 2011 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Jesse Anne Majors. Motions referred to Samuel Alba.(jmr)
June 24, 2011 Filing 6 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Jesse Anne Majors. (jmr)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Samuel Alba under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. Motions referred to Samuel Alba. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 6/17/2011. No attached document.(saw)
June 16, 2011 Filing 4 Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Support re 3 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Thomas Jefferson School of Law. (Wilde, Robert)
June 16, 2011 Filing 3 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Thomas Jefferson School of Law. (Wilde, Robert)
June 16, 2011 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Jesse Anne Majors, Defendant Thomas Jefferson School of Law. (jlw)
June 16, 2011 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District, Salt Lake County, case number 110911547. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4681044838), filed by Thomas Jefferson School of Law. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Amended Complaint, # 2 State Court Complaint, # 3 State Court Amended Summons, # 4 State Court Summons, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (jlw)
June 16, 2011 Magistrate Judge Samuel Alba added as referral magistrate judge. (asb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Majors v. Thomas Jefferson School of Law et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Anne Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Jefferson School of Law
Represented By: Bruce M. Franson
Represented By: Robert H. Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudy Hasl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Kransberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Mitnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claire Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Delman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Cromer-Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Larrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Ferreira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Bayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Dauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Chigos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Members of the Ethics Committee of Thomas Jefferson School of Law 2006-2011
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?