Slavens v. Millard County et al

Plaintiff: James K. Slavens
Defendant: Craig P. Greathouse, Millard County, Richard Waddingham, Daron P. Smith and Bart A. Whatcott
Case Number: 2:2011cv00568
Filed: June 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Millard
Presiding Judge: Paul M. Warner
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER denying 223 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 225 Motion for Costs; vacating 239 taxation of costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/19/13 (alt)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 188 Motion To Reconsider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 09/26/2013. (asp)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 168 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 09/22/2013. (asp)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 86 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 09/20/2013. (asp)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 PARTIAL MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting 86 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to James Slavens Estates (Estate) Utah Open and Public Meetings Act (UOPMA) claims and dismisses those portions of the Estates Complaint because they do not survive James Slavens death. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 09/11/2013. (asp)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 47 Motion to Strike 45 Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 06/06/2013. (asp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slavens v. Millard County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig P. Greathouse
Represented By: Kathleen M. Liuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millard County
Represented By: Kathleen M. Liuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Waddingham
Represented By: Kathleen M. Liuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daron P. Smith
Represented By: Kathleen M. Liuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bart A. Whatcott
Represented By: Kathleen M. Liuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James K. Slavens
Represented By: James K. Slavens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?