Nelder v. Bigelow et al
Plaintiff: Michael Paul Nelder
Defendant: A.C. Bigelow and Steve Turley
Case Number: 2:2012cv00245
Filed: March 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting 53 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 57 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 3/26/2015. (blh)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: Within 30 days, Defendant must file a summary-judgment motion. Alternatively, if requesting relief otherwise contemplated under the procedural rules, Defendant must do so within 30 days. If served with a summary-judgment motion, Plaintiff must submit a response within 30 days of the motions filing date. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 10/15/14. (jlw)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 1/9/13. (jlw)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS, ANSWER AND/OR DISPOSITIVE MOTION. It is hereby ordered United States Marshals Service Shall serve a completed summons, a copy of the Amended Complaint, and a copy of this Order upon the above listed defendant. See order for details. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 11/20/2012. (kpf)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM DECISION that Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of thisorder to cure the deficiencies noted in this order. If Plaintiff fails to timely cure the noted deficiencies according to the instructions here this action will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 05/15/2012. (asp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelder v. Bigelow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Paul Nelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.C. Bigelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?