Roberts et al v. C.R. England et al
Plaintiff: Charles Roberts and Kenneth McKay
Defendant: C.R. England, Opportunity Leasing and Horizon Truck Sales & Leasing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv00302
Filed: March 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 452 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: Defendants' 327 Motion to Alter or Amend [the] Class Certification Order is DENIED in part as to the opt-in notice provision with prejudice, and DENIED in part as to the remainder of the issues without prejudice. Defendants' 314 Motion to Certify Questions to the Utah Supreme Court is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 3/21/18. (dla)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 450 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 418 Motion to Expedite; granting in part and denying in part 418 Motion to Quash Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 3/12/2018. (jwt)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 442 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: Plaintiffs' 440 Motion to Stay Further Consideration of Defendants' Motion for Approval to Depose Absent Class Members Pending Consideration of Objection is GRANTED in part, and DENIED in part without prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 2/22/18. (dla)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 405 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 335 Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order for Approval to Depose Absent Class Members. Defendants are further ORDERED to provide an update to the court on the status of determining the exact number of necessary depositions within sixty (60) days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 11/13/2017. (jds)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 304 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: granting 189 Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 206 (SEALED) Sealed Motion Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification; denying 230 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 1/31/2017. (jds) Modified on 1/31/2017 - Unsealed and NEF regenerated (jds).
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 150 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 09/18/2013. (asp)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part 121 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 07/26/2013. (tls)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting 93 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 08/31/2012. (tls)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 06/22/2012. (tls)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts et al v. C.R. England et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Roberts
Represented By: Robert S. Boulter
Represented By: Adrian L. Canzoneri
Represented By: Joseph S. Goode
Represented By: Peter C. Lagarias
Represented By: Mark M. Leitner
Represented By: Brennan H. Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth McKay
Represented By: Robert S. Boulter
Represented By: Adrian L. Canzoneri
Represented By: Joseph S. Goode
Represented By: Peter C. Lagarias
Represented By: Mark M. Leitner
Represented By: Brennan H. Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. England
Represented By: David B. Dibble
Represented By: Scott A. Hagen
Represented By: Drew R. Hansen
Represented By: James S. Jardine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opportunity Leasing
Represented By: David B. Dibble
Represented By: Scott A. Hagen
Represented By: Drew R. Hansen
Represented By: James S. Jardine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Truck Sales & Leasing, LLC
Represented By: David B. Dibble
Represented By: Scott A. Hagen
Represented By: Drew R. Hansen
Represented By: James S. Jardine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?