Jensen v. West Jordan City et al

Plaintiff: Aaron Jensen
Defendant: West Jordan City, Dan Gallagher and Robert Shober
Case Number: 2:2012cv00736
Filed: July 27, 2012
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul M. Warner
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2016 186 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 146 Plaintiff's SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 152 Defendants' SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 8/11/2016. (eat)
November 20, 2015 124 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 116 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff shall fully respond to Document Requests 21 and 25 and immediately turn over the thirteen emails identified in their briefing. The remainder o f Defendants Motion is denied. Further, Defendants must file any opposition brief related to the pending motions to quash no later than December 4, 2015. (See Dkt. 61, 64.) This brief shall be limited to a single twelve-page document and shall includ e an initial section showing cause why the court should consider the tardy oppositions. Plaintiffs reply, if any, shall be filed no later than December 14, 2015, and must be no longer than ten pages. In the absence of any action by the parties, the court will simply grant the unopposed motions to quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/20/15. (jlw)
October 9, 2015 113 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 89 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Defendants shall designate their experts and serve their expert reports no later than November 23, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/9/2015. (las)
September 9, 2015 108 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion to Compel DIscovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/9/2015. (jwt)
September 4, 2015 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 82 Motion to Dismiss The court hereby DISMISSES without prejudice Plaintiffs claims for fraudulentmisrepresentation, negligent misrepresentation, and intentional infliction of economicrelations. Plaintiff may file a Third Amended Complaint that includes these three state lawclaims, provided that he also files an undertaking in the amount of $300.Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 9/4/2015. (jwt)
May 19, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 55 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 57 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 05/19/2015. (tls)
October 3, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 46 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/3/2014. (blh)
May 28, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 33 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/29/14. (jlw)
June 21, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 14 Motion to Dismiss ; denying 14 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 6/21/13. (jlw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jensen v. West Jordan City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Jensen
Represented By: Justin D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Jordan City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Shober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?