Bird v. West Valley City et al
Plaintiff: Karen Bird
Defendant: West Valley City and Kelly Davis
Case Number: 2:2012cv00903
Filed: September 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Paul M. Warner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 196 Motion to Stay Enforcement of Costs Award. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 7/22/2019. (jwt)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 169 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 3/28/2019. (las)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 59 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 9/28/2017. (las)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 02/03/2015. (tls)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 23 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 07/16/2014. (tls)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bird v. West Valley City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Bird
Represented By: April L. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Valley City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?