Securities and Exchange Commission v. McCabe

Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Colin McCabe
Case Number: 2:2013cv00161
Filed: March 5, 2013
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Brooke C. Wells
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:0078m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER denying 40 Motion to Compel Further Responses; granting 40 Motion to Compel Further Production of Documents; denying 42 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 5/22/2015. (blh)
December 30, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting 35 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 12/30/2014. (blh)
November 26, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 11/26/13. (ss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Jason M. Casey
Represented By: Nancy J. Gegenheimer
Represented By: Thomas M Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?