Ordonez v. Canyons School District
Plaintiff: Sonia Ordonez
Defendant: Canyons School District
Case Number: 2:2013cv00245
Filed: April 3, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J. Furse
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ADOPTING 122 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and granting Defendant's 96 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 8/1/2018. (eat)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; and dismissing 62 Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which this Court can grant relief, with the exception of her First Cause of Action for Retaliatory Failure to Transfer based on the February 2011 denial of transfer. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 9/28/2016. (eat)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 71 Motion for Extension of Time; and denying 73 Countermotion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 6/29/2016. (eat)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting 28 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED to locate pro bono counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 3/23/2015. (jds)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; granting 23 Motion to Dismiss ; adopting Report and Recommendations re 27 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 8/18/2014. (jds)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ordonez v. Canyons School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Ordonez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canyons School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?